EP1002911 - Modular concrete building system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.03.2003 [2003/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cantarano, Robert A. 215 Hanover Street Boston Massachusetts 02113 / US | For all designated states Fleischhacker, Peter Route 140, P.O. box 96 Gilmanton-I.W. New Hampshire 03837 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/21] | For all designated states Cantarano, Robert A. 215 Hanover Street Boston, Massachusetts 02113 / US | ||
For all designated states Fleischhacker, Peter Route 140, P.O. box 96 Gilmanton-I.W., New Hampshire 03837 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/21] | Representative(s) | Gibbs, Christopher Stephen Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/21] | Gibbs, Christopher Stephen Haseltine Lake & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 99309225.3 | 19.11.1999 | [2000/21] | Priority number, date | US19980197065 | 20.11.1998 Original published format: US 197065 | US19990313296 | 17.05.1999 Original published format: US 313296 | [2000/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1002911 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1002911 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | [2001/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E04B2/86, E04B1/61, E04B1/41, E04F13/04 | [2000/21] | CPC: |
E02D29/0283 (EP,US);
E04B1/4178 (EP,US);
E04B1/6179 (EP,US);
E04B2/8635 (EP,US);
E04B2/8647 (EP,US);
E04C2/044 (EP,US);
E04F13/18 (EP,US);
E04B1/6166 (EP,US);
E04B2002/867 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2002/27] |
Former [2000/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Modulares Betonkonstruktionssystem | [2000/21] | English: | Modular concrete building system | [2000/21] | French: | Système de construction modulaire en béton | [2000/21] | Examination procedure | 18.04.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/13] | 08.10.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.07.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.07.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.07.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 02.07.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 02.07.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.07.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 02.07.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 02.07.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 02.07.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.07.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 02.07.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.07.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.07.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.07.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 02.07.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 02.07.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 02.07.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.07.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 02.07.2002 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE4400572 (KOULUKALUSTO INTRIO OY [FI]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * column 1, line 17 - line 22 * * column 3, line 26 - column 4, line 35; figures 1-5 * [A] 12,14; | [XA]DE8617720U (GERHAHER & AL) [X] 1,4,5 * page 13, line 24 - page 15, line 11; figures 1-5 * [A] 12,14; | [XA]DE1905341 (FEUERSTEIN ELMAR, et al) [X] 6-9 * page 4, line 5 - line 14 * * page 11, line 14 - page 12, line 22; figures 8-10 * [A] 10; | [X]DE3502415 (PH KURTZ EISENHAMMER KG [DE]) [X] 6-9 * page 7, line 21 - page 10, line 20; figure - *; | [YA]GB2189825 (PENGUIN SWIMMING POOLS) [Y] 1,3,6,8 * page 2, line 44 - line 56 * * page 2, line 86 - line 110; figures 1,4 * [A] 12,14; | [YA]WO9701007 (PHILIPPE MICHEL [CA]) [Y] 1,3,6,8 * page 12, line 18 - page 14, line 15; figures 1-4 * [A] 12,14; | [A]US5709060 (VAUGHAN JAMIESON R [US], et al) [A] 7-9 * column 3, line 47 - column 5, line 2; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US5724782 (RICE RONALD D [US], et al) [A] 9 * column 1, line 24 - line 58; figures 1-3 *; | [A]CH608545 (MONNARD MICHEL [CH]) [A] 10 * page 3, column L, line 34 - column R, line 9; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US3238684 (PETER WOOD JOHN) [A] 11 * column 3, line 19 - line 32; figures 5,7 *; | [A]DE2835849 (MARONI FRANCESCO & CO) [A] 12 * page 10, line 4 - line 6; figures 6,11,12 *; | [A]GB2231351 (MOY PARK LTD [GB]) [A] 14 * page 7, line 14 - page 9, line 1; figure . *; | [A]FR724248 (DAMIANIK); | [A]FR2354416 (SUTHMEIER JUTTA [DE]) |