EP1017246 - Calculation of resource availability using degradation factors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.04.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CROSSKEYS SYSTEMS CORPORATION 350 Terry Fox Drive Kanata Ontario K2K 2W5 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2000/27] | For all designated states CROSSKEYS SYSTEMS CORPORATION 350 Terry Fox Drive Kanata Ontario K2K 2W5 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Forget, Leo 55 Forest Creek Sittsville, OntarioK2S 1M1 / CA | 02 /
Afnan, Omid 101-27 Henderson Avenue Ottawa, Ontario, K1N 7P3 / CA | [2000/27] | Representative(s) | Harding, Richard Patrick, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Harding, Richard Patrick, et al Marks & Clerk, 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | ||
Former [2002/50] | Harding, Richard Patrick, et al Marks & Clerk, 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | ||
Former [2000/27] | McLean, Robert Andreas, et al Dummett Copp, 25 The Square, Martlesham Heath Ipswich IP5 3SL / GB | Application number, filing date | 99309247.7 | 19.11.1999 | [2000/27] | Priority number, date | CA19980254285 | 20.11.1998 Original published format: CA 254285 | [2000/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1017246 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1017246 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | [2003/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/04, H04L12/24 | [2003/02] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0478 (EP);
H04L2012/5632 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/27] | H04Q11/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/27] | Title | German: | Berechnung der vorhandenen Resourcen unter Verwendung von Verminderungsfaktoren | [2000/27] | English: | Calculation of resource availability using degradation factors | [2000/27] | French: | Calcul de la disponibilité des ressources utilisant des facteurs de dégradation | [2000/27] | Examination procedure | 06.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/32] | 23.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/24] | 13.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.05.2002 | 30.11.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2758897 (INFOVISTA SA) [X] 1 * page 5, line 30 - page 6, line 2 * * page 9, line 18 - page 10, line 14 * * page 10, line 35 - line 36 * * page 16, line 1 - line 23 * * page 17, line 11 - line 15 * * page 19, line 29 - line 35 * * page 33, line 30 - line 31 *; | [X]US5802286 (DERE JUDY Y ET AL) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 4 - line 11 * * column 6, line 64 - column 7, line 26 * * column 8, line 46 - column 9, line 21 * * column 10, line 27 - column 13, line 63 * * claim 1 * | [X] - ANTONOPOULOS A ET AL, "A framework for the availability assessment of SDH transport networks", COMPUTERS AND COMMUNICATIONS, 1997. PROCEEDINGS., SECOND IEEE SYMPOSIUM ON ALEXANDRIA, EGYPT 1-3 JULY 1997, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19970701), ISBN 0-8186-7852-6, pages 666 - 670, XP010241432 [X] 1,2 * page 667, column 1, line 14 - line 16 * * page 668, column 1, line 1 - line 19 * * figures 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISCC.1997.616083 | [X] - QINGMING MA ET AL, "On path selection for traffic with bandwidth guarantees", NETWORK PROTOCOLS, 1997. PROCEEDINGS., 1997 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ATLANTA, GA, USA 28-31 OCT. 1997, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19971028), ISBN 0-8186-8061-X, pages 191 - 202, XP010258700 [X] 1,3 * page 192, column 1, paragraph 3.1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICNP.1997.643714 |