EP1026546 - Process for holography [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/32] | Recording medium and process for forming medium | ||
[2001/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.07.2003 [2003/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/32] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chandross, Edwin Arthur 14 Hunterdon Boulevard Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974 / US | 02 /
Dhar, Lisa 1200 Springfield Avenue, Apt. 1C New Providence, New Jersey 07974 / US | 03 /
Galvin-Donoghue, Mary Ellen 8 Lupine Lane Titusville, New Jersey 08560 / US | 04 /
Lowe-Harris, Alexander 21 Kensington Tr. Maplewood, New Jersey 07040 / US | 05 /
Patel, Sanjay 24 Holmes Oval South New Providence, New Jersey 07974 / US | 06 /
Schilling, Marcia Lea 54 Kinnan Way Basking Ridge, New Jersey 07920 / US | 07 /
Schnoes, Melinda Lamont 312 Henry St South Amboy, New Jersey 08879 / US | 08 /
Wiltzius, Pierre 26 Deer Run Millington, New Jersey 07946 / US | [2000/32] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/06] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | ||
Former [2000/32] | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB | Application number, filing date | 99309584.3 | 30.11.1999 | [2000/32] | Priority number, date | US19980206441 | 07.12.1998 Original published format: US 206441 | [2000/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1026546 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1026546 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/00, G03H1/02 | [2000/32] | CPC: |
G03H1/02 (EP);
G03H1/26 (KR);
G03F7/001 (EP);
G03H2001/026 (EP);
G03H2001/0264 (EP);
G03H2270/53 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/17] |
Former [2000/32] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Holographisches Verfahren | [2001/30] | English: | Process for holography | [2001/30] | French: | Procédé holographique | [2001/30] |
Former [2000/32] | Aufzeichnungsmaterial und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | ||
Former [2000/32] | Recording medium and process for forming medium | ||
Former [2000/32] | Matériau pour l'enregistrement et procédé de fabrication du matériau | Examination procedure | 30.11.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 15.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/32] | 17.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 08.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 07.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 01.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0353864 (MARCONI GEC LTD [GB]) [X] 1-3,8 * column 3, line 11 - column 4, line 29 *; | [A]EP0824222 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1,6-9,12-15 * column 1, line 9 - line 13 * * column 2, line 16 - line 31 * * column 3, line 11 - column 5, line 11 * * column 9, line 15 - column 10, line 30 * * claims 5,8 *; | [DA]US4187111 (CHANDROSS EDWIN A [US], et al) [DA] 1,2,8 * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 33 * * column 6, line 7 - column 7, line 10 *; | [DA]US4842968 (KOJIMA CHIAKI [JP], et al) [DA] 1 * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 28 * |