EP1014698 - Device-biased color converting apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester, New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roetling, Paul G. 1646 Shallow Creek Trail Webster, New York 14580-9605 / US | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | Skone James, Robert Edmund GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 99310255.7 | 16.12.1999 | [2000/26] | Priority number, date | US19980218090 | 22.12.1998 Original published format: US 218090 | [2000/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1014698 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1014698 | Date: | 21.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/60 | [2000/26] | CPC: |
H04N1/6058 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/11] |
Former [2000/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur vorangepassten Farbkonvertierung | [2000/26] | English: | Device-biased color converting apparatus and method | [2000/26] | French: | Procéde et dispositif pour la conversion polarisée de couleurs | [2000/26] | Examination procedure | 28.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/09] | 30.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 21.07.2004 | [2006/32] | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4682186 (SASAKI TAKASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,10 * abstract * [Y] 2-5; | [Y]EP0454275 (AGFA CORP [US]) [Y] 2-5 * abstract * * page 7, line 45 - line 55 *; | [A]EP0763929 (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]) [A] 2-5 * abstract *; | [A]US5319473 (HARRINGTON STEVEN J [US]) [A] * abstract *; | [A]EP0448250 (CROSFIELD ELECTRONICS LTD [GB]) [A] 6 * figures 5,6 *; | [A]EP0706285 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,10 * abstract *; | [A]WO9700495 (CANON INFORMATION SYST INC [US]); | [A]EP0785672 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) | Examination | US5818960 |