EP1017129 - Stud electrical connection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2005 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Newfrey LLC 1207 Drummond Plaza Newark Delaware 19711 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/05] | For all designated states Newfrey LLC 1207 Drummond Plaza Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | ||
Former [2003/03] | For all designated states Newfrey LLC Drummond Plaza Office Park, 1423, Kirkwood Highway Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | ||
Former [2002/27] | For all designated states EMHART LLC Drummond Plaza Office Park, 1423, Kirkwood Highway Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | ||
Former [2000/27] | For all designated states EMHART INC. Drummond Plaza Office Park, 1423, Kirkwood Highway Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shipp, Philip A 5660 Putman Drive West Bloomfield, Michigan 48323 / US | 02 /
Moring, Allen D 1590 Bournemouth Street Cross Pointe Woods, Michigan 48236 / US | [2000/27] | Representative(s) | Haar, Lucas Heinz Jörn, et al haarpatent Patentanwälte Krämer Meyer Goethestraße 2 61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | Haar, Lucas H., Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Haar & Schwarz-Haar, Karlstrasse 23 (Haus Otto) 61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | ||
Former [2000/27] | Bell, Ian Stephen, et al Black & Decker UK 210 Bath Road Slough SL1 3YD / GB | Application number, filing date | 99310282.1 | 21.12.1999 | [2000/27] | Priority number, date | US19980114410 | 31.12.1998 Original published format: US 114410 | US19990451583 | 30.11.1999 Original published format: US 451583 | [2000/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1017129 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1017129 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | [2000/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1017129 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/30, H01R4/64, B23K35/02, F16B19/05 | [2000/46] | CPC: |
H01R4/34 (EP,US);
H01R4/64 (EP,US);
H01R11/12 (EP,US);
H01R2201/26 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49117 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49208 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/27] | H01R4/30, H01R4/64 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/27] | Title | German: | Elektrischer Verbindungsbolzen | [2000/27] | English: | Stud electrical connection | [2000/27] | French: | Goujon de fixation électrique | [2000/27] | Examination procedure | 07.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/05] | 14.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/12] | Request for further processing for: | 20.03.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 20.03.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.04.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.03.2003 | BE | 26.03.2003 | CH | 26.03.2003 | FI | 26.03.2003 | GR | 26.03.2003 | LI | 26.03.2003 | NL | 26.03.2003 | DK | 26.06.2003 | PT | 26.06.2003 | SE | 26.06.2003 | DE | 27.06.2003 | ES | 30.09.2003 | CY | 21.12.2003 | GB | 21.12.2003 | LU | 21.12.2003 | IE | 22.12.2003 | [2005/23] |
Former [2005/03] | AT | 26.03.2003 | |
BE | 26.03.2003 | ||
CH | 26.03.2003 | ||
FI | 26.03.2003 | ||
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
LI | 26.03.2003 | ||
NL | 26.03.2003 | ||
DK | 26.06.2003 | ||
PT | 26.06.2003 | ||
SE | 26.06.2003 | ||
DE | 27.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
CY | 21.12.2003 | ||
GB | 21.12.2003 | ||
IE | 22.12.2003 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 26.03.2003 | |
BE | 26.03.2003 | ||
CH | 26.03.2003 | ||
FI | 26.03.2003 | ||
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
LI | 26.03.2003 | ||
NL | 26.03.2003 | ||
DK | 26.06.2003 | ||
PT | 26.06.2003 | ||
SE | 26.06.2003 | ||
DE | 27.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
CY | 21.12.2003 | ||
GB | 21.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | AT | 26.03.2003 | |
BE | 26.03.2003 | ||
CH | 26.03.2003 | ||
FI | 26.03.2003 | ||
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
LI | 26.03.2003 | ||
NL | 26.03.2003 | ||
DK | 26.06.2003 | ||
PT | 26.06.2003 | ||
SE | 26.06.2003 | ||
DE | 27.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
CY | 21.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | AT | 26.03.2003 | |
BE | 26.03.2003 | ||
CH | 26.03.2003 | ||
FI | 26.03.2003 | ||
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
LI | 26.03.2003 | ||
NL | 26.03.2003 | ||
DK | 26.06.2003 | ||
PT | 26.06.2003 | ||
SE | 26.06.2003 | ||
DE | 27.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | AT | 26.03.2003 | |
BE | 26.03.2003 | ||
CH | 26.03.2003 | ||
FI | 26.03.2003 | ||
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
LI | 26.03.2003 | ||
NL | 26.03.2003 | ||
PT | 26.06.2003 | ||
SE | 26.06.2003 | ||
DE | 27.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 26.03.2003 | |
CH | 26.03.2003 | ||
FI | 26.03.2003 | ||
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
LI | 26.03.2003 | ||
NL | 26.03.2003 | ||
PT | 26.06.2003 | ||
SE | 26.06.2003 | ||
DE | 27.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | AT | 26.03.2003 | |
CH | 26.03.2003 | ||
FI | 26.03.2003 | ||
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
LI | 26.03.2003 | ||
NL | 26.03.2003 | ||
PT | 26.06.2003 | ||
SE | 26.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | AT | 26.03.2003 | |
FI | 26.03.2003 | ||
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
SE | 26.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | AT | 26.03.2003 | |
FI | 26.03.2003 | ||
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | FI | 26.03.2003 | |
GR | 26.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | FI | 26.03.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3922050 (LETTINI MICHAEL J, et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]EP0640404 (LAMSON & SESSIONS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0641944 (EMHART INC [US]) [A] 1-6,9-15 * abstract * * column 6, line 3 - line 13 *; | [XA]EP0655559 (AVDEL SYSTEMS LTD [GB]) [X] 16-30 * abstract * [A] 14; | [XA]EP0663535 (EMHART INC [US]) [X] 16-30 * abstract * * column 5, line 38 - line 44 * [A] 14 |