EP1016681 - Silyl (meth)acrylate copolymers, processes for preparing the same, antifouling paint compositions containing the silyl (meth)acrylate copolymers, antifouling coating films formed from the antifouling paint compositions, antifouling methods using the antifouling paint compositions, and hulls or underwater structures coated with the antifouling coating films [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHUGOKU MARINE PAINTS, LTD. 1-7 Meijishinkai Ohtake-shi Hiroshima 739-0652 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/27] | For all designated states CHUGOKU MARINE PAINTS, LTD. 1-7, Meijishinkai Ohtake-shi, Hiroshima 739-0652 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsuboi, Makoto c/o Chugoku Marine Paints, Ltd., 1-7 Meijishinkai Ohtake-shi, Hiroshima 739-0652 / JP | 02 /
Yoshikawa, Eiichi c/o Chugoku Marine Paints, Ltd., 1-7 Meijishinkai Ohtake-shi, Hiroshima 739-0652 / JP | 03 /
Arimura, Hidetaka c/o Chugoku Marine Paints, Ltd., 1-7 Meijishinkai Ohtake-shi, Hiroshima 739-0652 / JP | 04 /
Hamazu, Fumio c/o Chugoku Marine Paints, Ltd., 1-7 Meijishinkai Ohtake-shi, Hiroshima 739-0652 / JP | 05 /
Nakamura, Naoya c/o Chugoku Marine Paints, Ltd., 1-7 Meijishinkai Ohtake-shi, Hiroshima 739-0652 / JP | 06 /
Hikiji, Yasuto c/o Chugoku Marine Paints, Ltd., 1-7 Meijishinkai Ohtake-shi, Hiroshima 739-0652 / JP | 07 /
Oya, Masaaki c/o Chugoku Marine Paints, Ltd., 1-7 Meijishinkai Ohtake-shi, Hiroshima 739-0652 / JP | 08 /
Hiyoshi, Satoshi c/o Chugoku Marine Paints, Ltd., 1-7 Meijishinkai Ohtake-shi, Hiroshima 739-0652 / JP | 09 /
Kozono, Yukio c/o Chugoku Marine Paints, Ltd., 1-7 Meijishinkai Ohtake-shi, Hiroshima 739-0652 / JP | [2000/27] | Representative(s) | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2000/27] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 99310578.2 | 24.12.1999 | [2000/27] | Priority number, date | JP19980374875 | 28.12.1998 Original published format: JP 37487598 | JP19980374876 | 28.12.1998 Original published format: JP 37487698 | JP19990004372 | 11.01.1999 Original published format: JP 437299 | JP19990133184 | 13.05.1999 Original published format: JP 13318499 | JP19990133307 | 13.05.1999 Original published format: JP 13330799 | [2000/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1016681 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1016681 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | [2000/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1016681 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C08F230/08, C09D5/16 | [2000/47] | CPC: |
C09D5/1668 (EP,US);
C08F230/085 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/27] | C08F30/08, C09D5/16 | Designated contracting states | BE, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IT, NL, PT, SE [2004/40] |
Former [2000/27] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Copolymere von Silyl(meth)acrylate, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung, fäulnisverhindernde Anstrichzusammensetzungen enthaltend diese Copolymere, fäulnisverhindernde Beschichtungsfilme aus fäulnisverhindernden Anstrichzusammensetzungen, Verfahren zu deren Benutzung, und beschichtete Schiffsrümpfe oder Unterwasserstrukturen | [2000/27] | English: | Silyl (meth)acrylate copolymers, processes for preparing the same, antifouling paint compositions containing the silyl (meth)acrylate copolymers, antifouling coating films formed from the antifouling paint compositions, antifouling methods using the antifouling paint compositions, and hulls or underwater structures coated with the antifouling coating films | [2000/27] | French: | Copolymères (méth)acrylate de silyle, procédés pour les préparer, compositions de peintures antisalissures contenant ces copolymères, revêtements antisalissures formés à partir de ces compositions, méthodes antisalissures reposant sur ces compositions, et coques ou structures sous-marines revêtues de la pellicule obtenue | [2000/27] | Examination procedure | 05.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/22] | 14.11.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0550998 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-7,10-13 * claims 1,6,7 * * page 6, lines 22-47 * * page 14, lines 8-11 * * page 17, line 35 - page 18, line 9 * * page 18, line 56 * * page 19, lines 16-25 *; | [DX]EP0802243 (NOF CORP [JP]) [DX] 1-7,10-13 * claims 1-5 * * page 4, lines 10-30 * * page 5, lines 36-42 * * page 6, lines 16-21 *; | [XA]EP0775733 (CHUGOKU MARINE PAINTS [JP]) [X] 3-13 * claims 1,3,23-28 * * examples COPOLYMER,3,7,PAGE,7,8 * * page 4, lines 18,26,31 * * page 6, line 1 - page 7, line 7 * * page 10, lines 29,43 * * page 11, line 39 - page 12, line 21 * * page 16, line 49 * [A] 1,2; | [XA]EP0714957 (NOF CORP [JP]) [X] 3-7,11-13 * claims 1-6 * * page 3, line 51 * * page 4 * * page 5, lines 2,38-47 * [A] 1,2; | [XA]US4687792 (RUSSELL DAVID B [US], et al) [X] 3-7,11-13 * claims 1,8 * * column 4, line 47 * * column 5, line 24 * * column 11, line 11 * [A] 1,2; | [DX]JPS63215780 ; | [X]JPH07150076 ; | [A]US4957989 (SAITOH NOBUHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-13 * claim 1 * * column 3, lines 29,30,36-44,61,64 * | [DX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890106), vol. 013, no. 003, Database accession no. (C - 557), & JP63215780 A 19880908 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEM INC) [DX] 3-5,11-13 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951031), vol. 1995, no. 09, & JP07150076 A 19950613 (CHUGOKU MARINE PAINTS LTD;OTHERS: 01) [X] 3-7,11-13 * abstract * |