Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100335246B | Global Dossier | 06.05.2002 | B1 | KR20010049196 | 15.06.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US43874199 | 11.11.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2001148974 | Global Dossier | 05.06.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US43874199 | 11.11.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1099377 | Global Dossier | 16.05.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US43874199 | 11.11.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1295792 | 23.05.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US43874199 | 11.11.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20000246L | 14.05.2001 | L | NO20000246D0 | 18.01.2000 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US43874199 | 11.11.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6186429 | 13.02.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US43874199 | 11.11.1999 |