EP1099377 - Magnetic bail actuation system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.04.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.06.2004 [2004/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zebco Sports Europe (Holdings) Limited Lancaster House, Ackhurst Business Park Chorley Lancashire PR7 1NY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/33] | For all designated states Zebco Sports Europe (Holdings) Limited Lancaster House, Ackhurst Business Park Chorley, Lancashire PR7 1NY / GB | ||
Former [2001/20] | For all designated states BRUNSWICK CORPORATION 1 North Field Court Lake Forest, Illinois 60045-4811 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cockerham, Rayford A. 1409 N. Umbrella Avenue, Broken Arrow Oklahoma 74012 / US | [2001/20] | Representative(s) | Gray, James, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/33] | Gray, James, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | ||
Former [2002/29] | Gray, James Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | ||
Former [2001/20] | Thomson, Paul Anthony Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside L41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 99310585.7 | 24.12.1999 | [2001/20] | Priority number, date | US19990438741 | 11.11.1999 Original published format: US 438741 | [2001/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1099377 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A01K89/01 | [2001/20] | CPC: |
A01K89/0108 (EP,KR,US);
A01K89/0114 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/20] | Title | German: | Magnetisches Betätigungssystem für den Schnurführungsbügel einer Angelrolle | [2001/20] | English: | Magnetic bail actuation system | [2001/20] | French: | Système d'actionnement magnétique pour l'étrier d'un moulinet | [2001/20] | Examination procedure | 13.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/02] | 08.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/24] | 23.12.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2002 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   20.02.2003 | 31.12.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH1014454 ; | [DA]US4792106 (HLAVA LORENS G [US]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980430), vol. 1998, no. 05, & JP10014454 A 19980120 (DAIWA SEIKO INC) [X] 1-9 * abstract * | by applicant | US4792106 | US4426045 |