EP1113435 - Identification of audio channels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/27] | Identification and selection of audio channels | ||
[2006/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2007 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.12.2007 [2007/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/02] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | ||
Former [2001/27] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moon, Seong-jin 1080-51 Daerim 2-dong Youngdeunpo-gu, Seoul / KR | 02 /
Oh, Young-nam 403-302 Satbyul Maeul, 39Pundang-dong Pundang-gu, Seongnam-city, Kyungki-do / KR | 03 /
Chung, Tae-yun 806-602 Jugong Apt., Burim-dong Kwacheon-city, Kyungki-do / KR | 04 /
Kang, Jung-suk 101-1310 Kunyoung Apt., 72-3 Munjeong-dong Songpa-gu, Seoul / KR | 05 /
Park, Pan-gie 422-202 Chungmyung Maeul Kunkyoung Apt., 1047-1 Youngtong-dong, Paldal-gu, Suwon-city / KR | 06 /
Park, Bong-kil 10-300 Shillimbon-dong Kwanak-gu, Seoul / KR | [2001/27] | Representative(s) | Robinson, Ian Michael, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/27] | Robinson, Ian Michael, et al Appleyard Lees, 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 99310630.1 | 29.12.1999 | [2001/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1113435 | Date: | 04.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1113435 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/10, G11B27/10 | [2001/27] | CPC: |
H04N9/8063 (EP);
G11B20/10 (EP);
G11B20/10194 (EP);
G11B27/105 (EP);
G11B27/3027 (EP);
H04N21/2368 (EP);
H04N21/4341 (EP);
H04N21/438 (EP);
H04N21/439 (EP);
G11B20/00992 (EP);
G11B2020/10537 (EP);
G11B2020/10546 (EP);
G11B2020/10592 (EP);
G11B2220/2545 (EP);
G11B2220/2562 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2002/13] |
Former [2001/27] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kennzeichen von Tonkanälen | [2006/30] | English: | Identification of audio channels | [2006/30] | French: | Identification de canaux audio | [2006/30] |
Former [2001/27] | Kennzeichen und Auswahl von Tonkanälen | ||
Former [2001/27] | Identification and selection of audio channels | ||
Former [2001/27] | Identification et sélection de canaux vidéo | Examination procedure | 13.01.2000 | Examination requested [2001/27] | 12.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP02078173.8 / EP1292125 | EP02078174.6 / EP1289278 | EP02078175.3 / EP1280337 | Opposition(s) | 11.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0727780 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO) [Y] 3-10 * abstract * * column 6, line 41 - column 8, line 38 * * column 9, line 33 - column 10, line 3 * [A] 1,2; | [YA]EP0757506 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO ;DOLBY LAB LICENSING CORP (US)) [Y] 3-10 * column 34, line 16 - line 53 * * column 35, line 35 - column 36, line 33 * * column 37, line 55 - column 38, line 21 * * column 41, line 3 - line 40; figure 62 * [A] 1,2; | [A]EP0855715 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 11, line 1 * * page 17, line 15 - page 23, line 3 *; | [A]WO9512276 (TIME WARNER ENTERTAINM CO LP) [A] 1-10 * page 20, line 29 - page 27, line 9; figure 5B * | Examination | EP0521487 |