EP0934915 - Self-leveling, very high performance concrete, process for its preparation and its utilisation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 25.10.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2013 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EIFFAGE TP 2 rue Hélène Boucher 93336 Neuilly sur Marne / FR | [2002/01] |
Former [1999/32] | For all designated states Entreprise Quillery & Cie 2, rue Hélène Boucher 93336 Neuilly sur Marne / FR | ||
For all designated states L'Entreprise Generale Industrielle 12, rue Hélène Boucher 93336 Neuilly sur Marne / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cadoret, Gael 18, avenue de la Bourdonnais 75007 Paris / FR | 02 /
Gilliers, Roland 12, rue Hélène Boucher BP 93 93337 Neuilly sur Marne Cedex / FR | 03 /
Thibaux, Thierry 12, rue Hélène Boucher BP 93 93337 Neuilly sur Marne Cedex / FR | [2013/48] |
Former [1999/32] | 01 /
Cadoret, Gael 18, avenue de la Bourdonnais 75007 Paris / FR | ||
02 /
Gilliers, Roland 12, rue Hélène Boucher, BP 93 93337 Neuilly sur Marne Cedex / FR | |||
03 /
Thibaux, Thierry 12, rue Hélène Boucher, BP 93 93337 Neuilly sur Marne Cedex / FR | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/36] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2003/16] | Touati, Catherine, et al Cabinet Plasseraud, 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [1999/32] | Picard, Jean-Claude Georges Cabinet Plasseraud 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 99400235.0 | 03.02.1999 | [1999/32] | Priority number, date | FR19980001416 | 06.02.1998 Original published format: FR 9801416 | [1999/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0934915 | Date: | 11.08.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0934915 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/20] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0934915 | Date: | 27.11.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C04B28/04, C04B40/00 | [1999/32] | CPC: |
C04B28/04 (EP);
C04B14/303 (EP);
C04B24/023 (EP);
C04B2111/62 (EP);
C04B2201/52 (EP);
Y02W30/91 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C04B14/303, C04B20/0076 (EP);
C04B24/023, C04B2103/32 (EP);
C04B28/04, C04B7/527, C04B14/303, C04B14/48, C04B18/146, C04B20/0076, C04B40/0028, C04B2103/32, C04B2103/50 (EP);
C04B28/04, C04B7/527, C04B14/303, C04B18/146, C04B20/0048, C04B20/0076, C04B40/06, C04B2103/32, C04B2103/50 (EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, GB, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/16] |
Former [1999/32] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Selbstnivellierender sehr hoher Leistungsbeton, Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung und seine Verwendung | [1999/32] | English: | Self-leveling, very high performance concrete, process for its preparation and its utilisation | [1999/32] | French: | Béton très haute performance, autonivelant, son procédé de preparation et son utilisation | [1999/32] | Examination procedure | 29.10.1999 | Examination requested [1999/52] | 12.02.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.05.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CY, FR, GR, IE | 12.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.02.2007
01.06.2012
WITHDRAWN LAFARGE 61, rue des Belles Feuilles 75116 Paris / FR Opponent's representative Richaud, Fabien, et al, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [2013/45] |
Former [2012/28] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.02.2007
01.06.2012
WITHDRAWN LAFARGE 61, rue des Belles Feuilles 75116 Paris / FR Opponent's representative Coret, Sophie V.G.A., et al, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2007/18] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.02.2007
21.02.2007
ADMISSIBLE LAFARGE 61, rue des Belles Feuilles 75116 Paris / FR Opponent's representative Coret, Sophie V.G.A., et al, et al Murgitroyd & Company, Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | 27.03.2007 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.10.2007 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.04.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.05.2009 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 19.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 29.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 20.02.2013 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 10.03.2013 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 13.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 17.10.2013 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 08.07.2009 | Appeal received No. T1430/09 | 25.09.2009 | Statement of grounds filed | 06.09.2012 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure | 06.09.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.09.2012 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.03.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   15.06.2001 | 28.02.2002 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   14.06.2002 | 29.02.2004 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   08.03.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 00/exclusive | For: | FR | Licencee: | SIKA, Société Anonyme 101, rue de Tolbiac 75654 Paris / FR | Date: | 06.05.2002 | [2002/41] |
Former [2002/27] | ID: | 01 00/exclusive | |
For: | all designated states | ||
Licencee: | SIKA, Société Anonyme 101, rue de Tolbiac 75654 Paris / FR | ||
Date: | 06.05.2002 | ||
[2002/41] | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]WO9501316 (BOUYGUES SA [FR]) [DY] 1-3,5,7,8,11,13 * claims 1,11,18,20,23,25,26 *; | BR8108596 [ ] (AALBORG PORTLAND CEMENT [DK]); | [A]WO9013524 (AALBORG PORTLAND CEMENT [DK]) [A] 1-3,11,13 * claims 1,21,25,26 *; | JPS59217658 [ ] (DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KK); | [A]JPH07144953 ; | JPH0558687 [ ] (OHBAYASHI CORP); | JPH02267146 [ ] (DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KK) | [Y] - H. BACHE, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19821213), vol. 97, no. 24, Database accession no. 202478a, page 281, XP000183952 [Y] 1-3,5,7,8,11,13 * abstract * | [A] - DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO K K, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19850520), vol. 102, no. 20, Database accession no. 171661v, page 315, XP000061373 [A] 1-5,11,13 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 95, no. 31, Database accession no. 95-237064, XP002081741 & JPH07144953 A 00000000 (ONODA CEMENT) [A] 6 * abstract * | [A] - A. NAKANE, ET AL, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19930712), vol. 119, no. 2, Database accession no. 14195e, page 370, XP000430692 [A] * abstract * | [A] - K. KO, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19910701), vol. 114, no. 26, Database accession no. 252812v, page 350, XP000194880 [A] * abstract * | Opposition | US4948429 |