EP0939312 - Apparatus for measuring the complex spectrum (amplitude and phase) of optical pulses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/35] | Method and apparatus for measuring the complex spectrum (amplitude and phase) of optical pulses | ||
[2009/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.05.2010 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.06.2010 [2010/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/28] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1999/35] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6, Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Debeau, Jean 19, rue de Placenn Ar Guer 22300 Lannion / FR | 02 /
Boittin, Rémi Saint Lavan 22300 Ploulec'h / FR | [1999/35] | Representative(s) | Benetiere, Marion, et al Orange IMTW/OLPS/IPL/PAT Orange Gardens 44 Avenue de la République, CS 50010 92326 Châtillon Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/14] | Benetiere, Marion, et al France Telecom R&D/PIV/Brevets 38-40, rue du Général Leclerc 92794 Issy les Moulineaux cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2008/13] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1999/35] | Poulin, Gérard, et al Société de Protection des Inventions 25, rue de Ponthieu 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 99400298.8 | 09.02.1999 | [1999/35] | Priority number, date | FR19980001694 | 12.02.1998 Original published format: FR 9801694 | [1999/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0939312 | Date: | 01.09.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0939312 | Date: | 08.07.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01J11/00, G01J9/02 | [1999/35] | CPC: |
G01J11/00 (EP,US);
G01J9/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2000/19] |
Former [1999/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Messen des komplexen Spektrums (Amplitude und Phase) von optischen Pulsen | [2009/12] | English: | Apparatus for measuring the complex spectrum (amplitude and phase) of optical pulses | [2009/12] | French: | Dispositif pour mesurer le spectre complexe (amplitude et phase) d'impulsions optiques | [2009/12] |
Former [1999/35] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Messen des komplexen Spektrums (Amplitude und Phase) von optischen Pulsen | ||
Former [1999/35] | Method and apparatus for measuring the complex spectrum (amplitude and phase) of optical pulses | ||
Former [1999/35] | Procédé et dispositif pour mesurer le spectre complexe (amplitude et phase) d'impulsions optiques | Examination procedure | 07.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/14] | 02.03.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.06.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 09.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.03.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19549303 (WISSENSCHAFTLICH TECH OPTIKZEN [DE]) [A] 1-21 * page 2, paragraph 3 * * claim 1 *; | [A] - TOMARU T ET AL, "LINEAR MEASUREMENT OF WEAK 1.57 MUM OPTICAL PULSE TRAIN BY HETERODYNE AUTOCORRELATION", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, (19961223), vol. 69, no. 26, pages 3978 - 3980, XP000643683 [A] 1-21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.117843 | [AD] - PRADE B S ET AL, "A SIMPLE METHOD FOR THE DETERMINATION OF THE INTENSITY AND PHASE OFULTRASHORT OPTICAL PULSES", OPTICS COMMUNICATIONS, (19941215), vol. 113, no. 1/03, pages 79 - 84, XP000485290 [AD] 1-21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0030-4018(94)90595-9 |