Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0944168
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
13.08.2004 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 29.09.2004 [2004/40] |
28.04.2004 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
31.03.2004 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
21.11.2003 |
First examination report |
|
13.11.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.02.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
14.02.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
06.04.2001 |
Change - representative |
published on 23.05.2001 [2001/21] |
27.01.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
14.06.2000 |
Change - extension states |
|
14.04.2000 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 31.05.2000 [2000/22] |
31.03.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.05.2000 [2000/20] |
06.08.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.09.1999 [1999/38] |