EP0944168 - Method for transmitting a command from a remote control apparatus to an audio apparatus, remote control apparatus and corresponding audio apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.08.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.09.2004 [2004/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/38] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Attimont, Luc 26, Rue de Paris 78560 Le Port Marly. / FR | 02 /
Bodin, Jannick 162, Grande Rue 92380 Garches / FR | [1999/38] | Representative(s) | Lamoureux, Bernard, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 54 Rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/21] | Lamoureux, Bernard, et al COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ALCATEL Dépt. Propriété industrielle 30, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1999/38] | Feray, Valérie, et al COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ALCATEL Dépt. Propriété Industrielle, 30, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 99400373.9 | 17.02.1999 | [1999/38] | Priority number, date | FR19980002823 | 09.03.1998 Original published format: FR 9802823 | [1999/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0944168 | Date: | 22.09.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H03J9/00 | [1999/38] | CPC: |
H03J9/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [2000/22] |
Former [1999/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Übertragung eines Befehls von einem Fernsteuergerät zu einem Audiogerät, Fernsteuergerät und übereinstimmendes Audiogerät | [1999/38] | English: | Method for transmitting a command from a remote control apparatus to an audio apparatus, remote control apparatus and corresponding audio apparatus | [1999/38] | French: | Procédé de transmission d'une commande d'un dispositif de commande à distance vers un appareil audio, dispositif de commande à distance et appareil audio correspondants | [1999/38] | Examination procedure | 22.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/20] | 17.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/40] | 03.05.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05327844 ; | [A]US3768019 (PODOWSKI R) [A] 7,14 * abstract *; | [A]US4386371 (GEORGE JOHN B) [A] 8,15 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0324284 (SATELLITE TECHNOLOGY SYSTEMS L [GB]) [Y] 1-6,9-13 * figures 1A,1B *; | [Y]JPH0514987 (SONY CORP) [Y] 1-6,9-13 * figures 1,2 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940314), vol. 018, no. 152, Database accession no. (E - 1523), & JP05327844 A 19931210 (SONY CORP) [A] 13 * abstract * |