EP0942387 - Procedure and system for multiple reading of a dynamic collection of labels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 29.11.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.11.2013 | Revocation of patent | published on 01.01.2014 [2014/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 31-33, rue de la Fédération 75015 Paris / FR | [1999/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vacherand, Francois 8, rue de Metz 38800 Le Pont de Claix / FR | 02 /
Crochon, Elisabeth 54, rue de Moucherotte 38320 Poisat / FR | [1999/37] | Representative(s) | Audier, Philippe André, et al BREVALEX 95 rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/02] | Audier, Philippe André, et al Brevalex, 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1999/37] | Des Termes, Monique, et al Société Brevatome 3, rue du Docteur Lanceraux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 99400567.6 | 09.03.1999 | [1999/37] | Priority number, date | FR19980003059 | 12.03.1998 Original published format: FR 9803059 | [1999/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0942387 | Date: | 15.09.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0942387 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/08, G06K7/10, G06K7/00 | [1999/37] | CPC: |
G06K7/10079 (EP);
G06K7/0008 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [2000/21] |
Former [1999/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zum mehrmals Lesen einer dynamischen Sammlung von Etiketten | [1999/37] | English: | Procedure and system for multiple reading of a dynamic collection of labels | [1999/37] | French: | Procédé et système de lecture multiple d'un ensemble dynamique d'étiquettes | [1999/37] | Examination procedure | 24.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/16] | 16.03.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.06.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY | 27.06.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, FI, FR, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 09.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.02.2007
01.03.2007
ADMISSIBLE Giesecke & Devrient GmbH Prinzregentenstrasse 159 81677 München / DE Opponent's representative Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/24] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.02.2007
01.03.2007
ADMISSIBLE Giesecke & Devrient GmbH Prinzregentenstrasse 159 81677 München / DE Opponent's representative Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/18] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.02.2007
01.03.2007
ADMISSIBLE Giesecke & Devrient GmbH Prinzregentenstrasse 159 81677 München / DE | 26.03.2007 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.07.2007 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.07.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.08.2008 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 06.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 23.07.2013 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2014/01] | Appeal following opposition | 12.09.2008 | Appeal received No. T1780/08 | 08.12.2008 | Statement of grounds filed | 28.06.2013 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 28.06.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.07.2013 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.04.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 28.08.2006 | [2006/50] | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]FR2677135 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]); | [A]EP0585132 (CSIR [ZA]); | [A]US5339073 (DODD HAROLD [GB], et al) |