EP0945601 - Device for uniformly diluting exhaust gas from a military vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.2004 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.05.2004 [2004/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GIAT Industries 13, route de la Minière 78000 Versailles / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/39] | For all designated states GIAT INDUSTRIES 13, route de la Minière 78000 Versailles / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brun, Michel 51, square des Alpilles 78370 Maurepas / FR | 02 /
Cottet-Dumoulin, Jean 127, rue de Gascogne 95130 Franconville / FR | 03 /
Carlier, Sylvain 4, rue Louis Bréguet 78280 Guyancourt / FR | 04 /
Fontaine, Fabrice 19c, avenue de Sceaux 78000 Versailles / FR | [1999/39] | Representative(s) | Célanie, Christian Cabinet Célanie 5 Avenue de Saint Cloud B.P. 214 78002 Versailles Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/39] | Célanie, Christian Cabinet Célanie, 13 route de la Minière, BP 214 78002 Versailles Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 99400576.7 | 10.03.1999 | [1999/39] | Priority number, date | FR19980003720 | 26.03.1998 Original published format: FR 9803720 | [1999/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0945601 | Date: | 29.09.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0945601 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F01N7/08, F01N3/02 | [1999/39] | CPC: |
F01N13/082 (EP);
F01N3/05 (EP);
F41H3/00 (EP);
F01N2470/02 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [2000/24] |
Former [1999/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum gleichmässigen Verdünnen von Abgas von einem Militärfahrzeug | [1999/39] | English: | Device for uniformly diluting exhaust gas from a military vehicle | [1999/39] | French: | Dispositif de dilution uniforme des gaz d'échappement d'un véhicule militaire | [1999/39] | Examination procedure | 15.10.1999 | Examination requested [1999/50] | 12.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4864819 (STEYER WILLIAM [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 54 - column 8, line 11; figure - *; | [A]US2112534 (KEEN JOHN S) [A] 1 * page 2, line 19 - line 31; figures 1,4 * |