EP0955314 - Peptide analogues of glucagon-like-peptide-1 (7-37), their preparation and pharmaceutical compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.2004 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.11.2004 [2004/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Les Laboratoires Servier 22, rue Garnier 92200 Neuilly sur Seine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/47] | For all designated states LES LABORATOIRES SERVIER 22, rue Garnier 92200 Neuilly sur Seine / FR | ||
Former [1999/45] | For all designated states ADIR ET COMPAGNIE 1 rue Carle Hébert 92415 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Calas, Bernard 360, rue du Père Prévost 34000 Montpellier / FR | 02 /
Grassy, Gérard 32, rue Pradas 34470 Perols / FR | 03 /
Chavanieu, Alain 680, Chemin des Bousquets 34820 Assas / FR | 04 /
Sarrauste de Menthiere, Cyril Apt. 5320, 206, rue Fabri de Peiresc 34000 Montpellier / FR | 05 /
Renard, Pierre 3, avenue du Parc 78150 Le Chesnay / FR | 06 /
Pfeiffer, Bruno 47, rue Ernest Renan 95320 Saint Leu La Foret / FR | 07 /
Manechez, Dominique. 16 rue Maxence van der Meersch 59650 Villeneuve D ascq / FR | [1999/49] |
Former [1999/45] | 01 /
Calas, Bernard 360, rue du Père Prévost 34000 Montpellier / FR | ||
02 /
Grassy, Gérard 32, rue Pradas 34470 Perols / FR | |||
03 /
Chavanieu, Alain 680, Chemin des Bousquets 34820 Assas / FR | |||
04 /
Sarrauste de Menthiere, Cyril Apt. 5320, 206, rue Fabri de Peiresc 34000 Montpellier / FR | |||
05 /
Renard, Pierre 3, avenue du Parc 78150 Le Chesnay / FR | |||
06 /
Pfeiffer, Bruno 47, rue Maxence van der Meersch 59650 Villeneuve d'Ascq / FR | |||
07 /
Manechez, Dominique. 16 rue Maxence van der Meersch 59650 Villeneuve D ascq / FR | Application number, filing date | 99400613.8 | 12.03.1999 | [1999/45] | Priority number, date | FR19980004559 | 10.04.1998 Original published format: FR 9804559 | [1999/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0955314 | Date: | 10.11.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0955314 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | [2000/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0955314 | Date: | 03.12.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/605, A61K38/30 | [2000/14] | CPC: |
C07K14/605 (EP,US);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P5/48 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/45] | C07K14/605, A61K38/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/49] |
Former [1999/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Peptidanaloge des Glucagon-ähnlichen-Peptids-1 (7-37), deren Herstellung und pharmazeutische Zusammensetzungen | [2003/29] | English: | Peptide analogues of glucagon-like-peptide-1 (7-37), their preparation and pharmaceutical compositions | [1999/45] | French: | Composés peptidiques analogues du glucagon-like-peptide-1 (7-37), leur procédé de préparation et les compositions pharmaceutiques qui les contiennent | [1999/45] |
Former [1999/45] | Peptidanaloge des Glucagon-like-Peptide-1 (7-37), deren Herstellung und pharmazeutische Zusammensetzungen | Examination procedure | 31.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/45] | 20.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DXY]WO9111457 (BUCKLEY DOUGLAS I [US], et al) [DX] 1-3,5,7,9,11,14,16,23-26 * the whole document * [Y] 1-26; | [Y]WO9325579 (PFIZER [US], et al) [Y] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [DXY]EP0658568 (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [DX] 1-3,5,7,9,11,14,16,23-26 * the whole document * [Y] 1-26; | [DXY]EP0733644 (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [DX] 1-3,5,7,9,11,14,16,23-26 * the whole document * [Y] 1-26; | [PX]WO9843658 (LILLY CO ELI [US], et al) [PX] 1,3,5,7,9,11,23-26* the whole document *; | [Y] - SVETLANA MOJSOV, "STRUCTURAL REQUIREMENTS FOR BIOLOGICAL ACTIVITY OF GLUCAGON-LIKE PEPTIDE-I", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PEPTIDE AND PROTEIN RESEARCH, (19920901), vol. 40, no. 3 / 04, pages 333 - 343, XP000311244 [Y] 1-26 * the whole document * | [Y] - GEFEL D ET AL, "GLUCAGON-LIKE PEPTIDE-I ANALOGS: EFFECTS ON INSULIN SECRETION AND ADENOSINE 3',5'-MONOPHOSPHATE FORMATION", ENDOCRINOLOGY, (19900401), vol. 126, no. 4, pages 2164 - 2168, XP000574862 [Y] 1-26 * the whole document * | [Y] - SUZUKI S ET AL, "COMPARISON OF THE EFFECTS OF VARIOUS C-TERMINAL AND N-TERMINAL FRAGMENT PEPTIDES OF GLUCAGON-LIKE PEPTIDE-1 ON INSULIN AND GLUCAGON RELEASE FROM THE ISOLATED PERFUSED RAT PANCREAS", ENDOCRINOLOGY, (19891201), vol. 125, no. 6, pages 3109 - 3114, XP000574778 [Y] 1-26 * the whole document * |