EP0948989 - Process and unit for producing oxygen by adsorption with short cycle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.06.2003 [2003/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'air Liquide, S.A. à Directoire et Conseil de Surveillance pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/17] | For all designated states L'air Liquide, S.A. à Directoire et Conseil de Surveillance pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [1999/41] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Derive, Nathalie 22 rue Beaurepaire 75010 Paris / FR | 02 /
Dubois, Anne 3 rue Saint Claire 78150 Le Chesnay / FR | 03 /
Monereau, Christian 159 rue de Charonne 75011 Paris / FR | [1999/41] | Representative(s) | Le Moenner, Gabriel, et al Societé l'Air Liquide Service Brevets et Marques 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/41] | Le Moenner, Gabriel, et al Societé l'Air Liquide Service Brevets et Marques 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 99400758.1 | 29.03.1999 | [1999/41] | Priority number, date | FR19980004305 | 07.04.1998 Original published format: FR 9804305 | [1999/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0948989 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/053, C01B13/02 | [1999/41] | CPC: |
B01D53/0473 (EP,US);
B01D53/0476 (EP,US);
B01D53/053 (EP,US);
C01B13/0259 (EP,US);
B01D2256/12 (EP,US);
B01D2257/102 (EP,US);
B01D2259/40015 (EP,US);
B01D2259/4003 (EP,US);
B01D2259/40032 (EP,US);
B01D2259/40052 (EP,US);
B01D2259/40064 (EP,US);
B01D2259/40067 (EP,US);
B01D2259/40081 (EP,US);
B01D2259/402 (EP,US);
C01B2210/0046 (EP,US);
C01B2210/0051 (EP,US);
C01B2210/0062 (EP,US);
C01B2210/007 (EP,US);
Y02P30/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [2000/26] |
Former [1999/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Produktion von Sauerstoff durch Adsorption mit kurzem Zyklus | [1999/41] | English: | Process and unit for producing oxygen by adsorption with short cycle | [1999/41] | French: | Procédé et unité de production d'oxygene par adsorption avec cycle court | [1999/41] | Examination procedure | 13.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 29.04.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0663229 (SUMITOMO SEIKA CHEMICALS [JP]) [A] 1,6,8 * figure 1; claims 1,8,9 *; | [A]EP0743087 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]) [A] 1,3,8 * the whole document *; | [A]US5163978 (LEAVITT FREDERICK W [US], et al) [A] 1,8 * column 6, line 36 - column 8, line 21; figure 2; claim 1 *; | [AD]EP0758625 (SUMITOMO SEIKA CHEMICALS [JP]) [AD] 1,8 * claims 1,2 * |