EP0952284 - Locking device for a sliding wing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.2004 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.08.2004 [2004/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ferco International Ferrures et Serrures de Bâtiment 2, rue du Vieux Moulin 57445 Réding / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/34] | For all designated states Ferco International Ferrures et Serrures de Bâtiment 2, rue du Vieux Moulin 57445 Réding / FR | ||
Former [1999/43] | For all designated states Ferco International Ferrures et Serrures de Bâtiment 2, rue du Vieux Moulin 57400 Réding / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Supernat, Thierry 34, rue Robert Schuman 57670 Nebing / FR | 02 /
Prevot, Gérard 39, rue de Herbitzheim 57430 Willerwald / FR | [1999/43] | Representative(s) | Keib, Gérard, et al Pontet Allano & Associés S.E.L.A.R.L. 6 Avenue du Général de Gaulle 78000 Versailles / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/29] | Keib, Gérard, et al Pontet Allano & Associés S.E.L.A.R.L. 6 avenue du Général de Gaulle 78000 Versailles / FR | ||
Former [1999/43] | Keib, Gérard, et al NOVAMARK TECHNOLOGIES Anciennement Brevets Rodhain & Porte 122, Rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois Perret Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 99400825.8 | 02.04.1999 | [1999/43] | Priority number, date | FR19980004850 | 17.04.1998 Original published format: FR 9804850 | [1999/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0952284 | Date: | 27.10.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0952284 | Date: | 20.08.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | E05B65/08, E05C9/00 | [1999/43] | CPC: |
E05B65/087 (EP,US);
E05C9/22 (EP,US);
E05B63/0004 (EP,US);
Y10S292/46 (EP,US);
Y10T292/0968 (EP,US);
Y10T292/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, GB, GR, IT [2000/27] |
Former [1999/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verriegelungsvorrichtung für einen Schiebeflügel | [1999/43] | English: | Locking device for a sliding wing | [1999/43] | French: | Dispositif de verrouillage pour ouvrant coulissant | [1999/43] | Examination procedure | 30.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/49] | 28.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.08.2003 | [2004/14] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0409754 (FERCO INT USINE FERRURES [FR]) [A] 1* figures 2,6 *; | [A]EP0801194 (ATP SA [ES]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |