EP0965898 - Autonomous fluid flow limiting device for a conduit and aircraft fuel installation incorporating it [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.11.2002 [2002/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AEROSPATIALE MATRA 37, Boulevard de Montmorency 75016 Paris / FR | [2000/14] |
Former [1999/51] | For all designated states AEROSPATIALE SOCIETE NATIONALE INDUSTRIELLE 37 boulevard de Montmorency 75016 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fabre, Christian 10, rue du Pic du Midi 31170 Tournefeuille / FR | [1999/51] | Representative(s) | Bonnetat, Christian Gevers France 41, avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/51] | Bonnetat, Christian CABINET BONNETAT 29, rue de St. Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 99400907.4 | 14.04.1999 | [1999/51] | Priority number, date | FR19980007741 | 19.06.1998 Original published format: FR 9807741 | [1999/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0965898 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0965898 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G05D7/01, F16K47/00, F02C7/232 | [1999/51] | CPC: |
G05D7/0106 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7787 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7791 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT, SE [2000/35] |
Former [1999/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Eigenständige Vorrichtung zur Durchflussbegrenzung eines Fluides in einer Leitung und Treibstoffkreis eines Flugzeuges mit einer solchen Vorrichtung | [1999/51] | English: | Autonomous fluid flow limiting device for a conduit and aircraft fuel installation incorporating it | [1999/51] | French: | Dispositif autonome de limitation du débit d'un fluide dans une canalisation et circuit de carburant pour aéronef comportant un tel dispositif | [1999/51] | Examination procedure | 08.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/14] | 26.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4210171 (RIKUTA [JP]) [A] 1 * column A * * column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 12 * * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 53; figures 1-4 *; | [A]AT319675B (SAMSON APPBAU A G [DE]) [A] 1 * page 2, lines 1-54; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0751448 (LANDIS & GYR TECH INNOVAT [CH]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 1, lines 19-35 * * column 1, line 47 - column 2, line 59; figure 1 *; | [A]DE4316484 (SAMSON AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 2, line 19 - column 3, line 10; figure 1 *; | [A]US3428080 (BROWN LEWIS E) [A] 1 * column 2, line 10 - column 3, line 2 * * column 3, line 35 - column 4 * * column 4, lines 46-50; figures 1,2 * |