EP0962220 - Dying composition for keratinous fibres with a direct cationic dye and a polyol or a polyolether [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 25.07.2008 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/49] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lang, Gérard 51B, rue Robert Thomas 95390 Saint Prix / FR | 02 /
Cotteret, Jean 13, rue du Pré Rousselin 78480 Verneuil/Seine / FR | [1999/49] | Representative(s) | Miszputen, Laurent L'Oréal Service DIPI 9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus 92110 Clichy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | Miszputen, Laurent L'Oréal - D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier 92600 Asnières / FR | ||
Former [1999/49] | Miszputen, Laurent L'Oreal, DPI, 6 rue Sincholle 92585 Clichy Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 99401100.5 | 05.05.1999 | [1999/49] | Priority number, date | FR19980006752 | 28.05.1998 Original published format: FR 9806752 | [1999/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0962220 | Date: | 08.12.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0962220 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | [2000/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0962220 | Date: | 08.03.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/34, A61K8/49, A61Q5/10 | [2006/09] | CPC data not yet available |
Former IPC [1999/49] | A61K7/13 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/49] | Title | German: | Färbezusammensetzung für keratinische Fäser mit einem direktziehenden kationischen Farbstoff und einem Polyol oder einem Polyolether | [1999/49] | English: | Dying composition for keratinous fibres with a direct cationic dye and a polyol or a polyolether | [1999/49] | French: | Composition de teinture pour fibres kératiniques avec un colorant direct cationique et un polyol ou ether de polyol | [2000/03] |
Former [1999/49] | Composition de teinture pour fibres kérantiniques avec un colorant direct cationique et un polyol ou ether de polyol | Examination procedure | 08.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/45] | 06.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 15.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
07.12.2006
ADMISSIBLE Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien VTP/Patente Henkelstrasse 67 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [2007/02] | 16.01.2007 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 25.09.2007 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 09.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 19.04.2008 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2008/35] | Request for further processing for: | 18.10.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 18.10.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.01.2006 | Decision despatched | 15.09.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 15.09.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.11.2004 | Decision despatched | 01.10.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 01.10.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.10.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.03.2006 | CY | 08.03.2006 | FI | 08.03.2006 | IE | 08.03.2006 | NL | 08.03.2006 | LU | 05.05.2006 | BE | 31.05.2006 | CH | 31.05.2006 | LI | 31.05.2006 | MC | 31.05.2006 | DK | 08.06.2006 | SE | 08.06.2006 | GR | 09.06.2006 | PT | 08.08.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/36] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
IE | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
LU | 05.05.2006 | ||
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
CH | 31.05.2006 | ||
LI | 31.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
GR | 09.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
IE | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
CH | 31.05.2006 | ||
LI | 31.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
GR | 09.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
IE | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
CH | 31.05.2006 | ||
LI | 31.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
IE | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
CH | 31.05.2006 | ||
LI | 31.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
IE | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
IE | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 08.03.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3985499 (LANG GERARD, et al) [X] 1-23* example N; claim 1 * |