Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0955285
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
15.11.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] |
21.09.2002 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 06.11.2002 [2002/45] |
28.09.2001 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 14.11.2001 [2001/46] |
20.07.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
30.05.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
03.05.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
03.05.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
26.01.2001 |
First examination report |
|
23.01.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
31.07.2000 |
Change - extension states |
|
02.06.2000 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 19.07.2000 [2000/29] |
03.12.1999 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.01.2000 [2000/03] |
24.09.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.11.1999 [1999/45] |