Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH11322662 | Global Dossier | 24.11.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | JP12471798 | 07.05.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0955285 | Global Dossier | 14.11.2001 | B1 | EP0955285 | 10.11.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP12471798 | 07.05.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69900448T | 06.06.2002 | T2 | DE69900448D1 | 20.12.2001 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP12471798 | 07.05.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6169211 | 02.01.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP12471798 | 07.05.1998 |