EP0955285 - Process and apparatus for production of 5-cyclohexadecen-1-one [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takasago International Corporation 5-37-1, Kamata, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/45] | For all designated states Takasago International Corporation 5-37-1, Kamata, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Itakura, Keisuke, Takasago International Corp. Ctr. Res. Lab., 4-11, Nishiyawata 1-chome Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Yamamoto, Kenichi, Takasago International Corp. Ctr. Res. Lab., 4-11, Nishiyawata 1-chome Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Yagi, Misao, Takasago International Corp. Ctr. Res. Lab., 4-11, Nishiyawata 1-chome Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Amano, Akira, Takasago International Corp. Ctr. Res. Lab., 4-11, Nishiyawata 1-chome Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1999/45] | Representative(s) | Uchida, Kenji, et al Fédit-Loriot 38, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/45] | Uchida, Kenji, et al S.A. Fedit-Loriot et Autres Conseils en Propriété Industrielle, 38, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 99401101.3 | 05.05.1999 | [1999/45] | Priority number, date | JP19980124717 | 07.05.1998 Original published format: JP 12471798 | [1999/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0955285 | Date: | 10.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0955285 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07C45/51, C07C49/587 | [1999/45] | CPC: |
C07C45/512 (EP,US);
C07C49/587 (EP,US);
Y02P20/582 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C45/512, C07C49/587 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, LI [2000/29] |
Former [1999/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von 5-Cyclohexadecen-1-on | [1999/45] | English: | Process and apparatus for production of 5-cyclohexadecen-1-one | [1999/45] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour la production de 5-cyclohexadécène-1-one | [1999/45] | Examination procedure | 24.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/03] | 25.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 14.11.2001 | LI | 14.11.2001 | [2003/01] | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]GB1315438 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [DA] 1 * claim - *; | [DA]US3914315 (MIYAKE AKIHISA, et al) [DA] 1 * claim - * |