EP0955303 - Ruthenium-iodo-optically active phosphine complex [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.10.2007 [2007/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takasago International Corporation 5-37-1, Kamata, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/45] |
Former [1999/45] | For all designated states Takasago International Corporation 5-37-1, Kamata, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okeda, Yoshiki, Takasago International Corp. Ctr. Res. Lab., 4-11, Nishiyawata 1-chome Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Hashimoto, Tsutomu, Takasago International Corp. Ctr. Res. Lab., 4-11, Nishiyawata 1-chome Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Hori, Yoji, Takasago International Corp. Ctr. Res. Lab., 4-11, Nishiyawata 1-chome Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 04 /
Hagiwara, Toshimitsu, Takasago International Corp. Ctr. Res. Lab., 4-11, Nishiyawata 1-chome Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [1999/45] | Representative(s) | Uchida, Kenji, et al Fédit-Loriot 38, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/45] | Uchida, Kenji, et al S.A. Fedit-Loriot et Autres Conseils en Propriété Industrielle, 38, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 99401120.3 | 07.05.1999 | [1999/45] | Priority number, date | JP19980142233 | 08.05.1998 Original published format: JP 14223398 | JP19990093644 | 31.03.1999 Original published format: JP 9364499 | [1999/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0955303 | Date: | 10.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/45] | Type: | A1 / A2 RE Reissue of A-publication | No.: | EP0955303 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | [2000/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0955303 | Date: | 03.01.2001 | [2001/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0955303 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07F15/00, C07D305/12, B01J31/24 | [1999/45] | CPC: |
B01J31/2409 (EP,US);
B01J31/2452 (EP,US);
B01J31/2457 (EP,US);
C07D315/00 (EP,US);
C07F15/0053 (EP,US);
B01J2231/645 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [2001/38] |
Former [1999/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Ruthenium-iodo optisch aktiver Phosphinkomplex | [1999/45] | English: | Ruthenium-iodo-optically active phosphine complex | [1999/45] | French: | Complexe ruthénium-iodo-phosphine optiquement actif | [1999/45] | Examination procedure | 18.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/25] | 18.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5412109 (TAKAYA HIDEMASA [JP], et al) [X] 1-16 * column W *; | [PX]EP0850945 (TAKASAGO PERFUMERY CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [DPX]EP0841343 (TAKASAGO PERFUMERY CO LTD [JP]) [DPX] 1-16 * the whole document * | [X] - MASHIMA, K. ET AL., "cationic binap-ru(II) halide complexes: highly efficient catalysts for stereoselective asymmetric hydrogenation of alpha- and beta-functionalized ketones", THE JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1994), vol. 59, pages 3064 - 3076, XP002151743 [X] 1-15 * whole document; in particular compound (S)-5c * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00090a026 | [DX] - MASHIMA, K. ET AL., "synthesis and characterization of mono- and tri-nuclear ruthenium complexes of 2,2'-bis(diphenylphosphino)-1,1'-binaphthyl and their catalytic activity", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, DALTON TRANSACTIONS, (1992), pages 2099 - 2107, XP002151744 [DX] 1-15 * whole document; in particular compounds (S)-3e, (S)-4d, (S)-6c * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/dt9920002099 |