EP0959186 - An automatic water flushing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/47] | An automatic flushing device | ||
[2003/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Celec Conception Electronique 6, rue Ste Radegonde 76270 Neufchâtel-en-Bray / FR | [1999/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leblond, Jean-Marie 14, rue Dénoyelle 76270 Neufchâtel-en-Bray / FR | [1999/47] | Representative(s) | Kohn, Philippe Cabinet Philippe Kohn 30, rue Hoche 93500 Pantin / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/47] | Kohn, Philippe Cabinet Philipp Kohn, 30, rue Hoche 93500 Pantin / FR | Application number, filing date | 99401163.3 | 11.05.1999 | [1999/47] | Priority number, date | FR19980006249 | 18.05.1998 Original published format: FR 9806249 | [1999/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0959186 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0959186 | Date: | 03.09.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | E03D5/10, E03D1/30 | [1999/47] | CPC: |
E03D5/10 (EP);
E03D1/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/31] |
Former [1999/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Automatische Wasserspülung | [2003/15] | English: | An automatic water flushing device | [2003/15] | French: | Chasse d'eau automatique | [2003/15] |
Former [1999/47] | Automatische Spüleinrichtung | ||
Former [1999/47] | An automatic flushing device | ||
Former [1999/47] | Châsse d'eau automatique | Examination procedure | 17.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/25] | 20.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2219367 (SPENCER JOHNSON) [A] 1-8 * page 1, column R, line 33 - page 2, column R, line 48; figure - *; | [A]FR2297293 (NEWBOULD ENGINEERING SERVICES [GB]) [A] 1,12 * page 2, line 10 - page 3, line 1; figures 2,3 *; | [A]EP0038782 (CALAPRICE CARLO) [A] 1* page 7, line 10 - line 27; figure - * |