EP0959258 - Sealing arrangement for a roller contact bearing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RKS S.A. Route de Vassy 89204 Avallon / FR | [1999/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Catalano, Denis RKS S.A. - SKF -, Route de Vassy 89204 Avallon Cédex / FR | 02 /
Jorrot, François-Xavier RKS S.A. - SKF -, Route de Vassy 89204 Avallon Cédex / FR | 03 /
Bourgeois-Jacquet, Pierre RKS S.A. - SKF -, Route de Vassy 89204 Avallon Cédex / FR | [1999/47] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/47] | Casalonga, Axel BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99401184.9 | 17.05.1999 | [1999/47] | Priority number, date | FR19980006414 | 20.05.1998 Original published format: FR 9806414 | [1999/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0959258 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0959258 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F16C33/78 | [1999/47] | CPC: |
F16C19/166 (EP,US);
F16C33/58 (EP,US);
F16C33/76 (EP,US);
F16C2300/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, GB, IT, NL [2000/31] |
Former [1999/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Dichtungsanordnung für ein Wälzlager | [1999/47] | English: | Sealing arrangement for a roller contact bearing | [1999/47] | French: | Agencement d'étanchéité pour un roulement | [1999/47] | Examination procedure | 08.11.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/04] | 07.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Opposition(s) | 05.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 02.05.2007 | NL | 02.05.2007 | [2008/21] |
Former [2008/17] | NL | 02.05.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1919431 (SKF SVENSKA KULLAGERFAB AB) [X] 1-4 * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 2; figure 1 *; | [A]US5683186 (AKIMOTO TOSHITAKA [JP]) [A] 6,9 * column 4, line 12 - line 57; figure 1 *; | [A]GB1099936 (POLLARD BEARINGS LTD) [A] 7 * figure 2; claims 1-4 *; | [A]US2276225 (CARTER EDGAR R) [A] 1 * column 1, line 41 - column 2, line 26; figure 1 *; | [A]FR1383004 (H. ZILLER) [A] 1 * page 4; figures 12,15 *; | [A]US3203740 (PEICKII VASALIE L, et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 60 - line 75; figure 2 *; | [DA]DE3435437 (SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER KG [DE]) [DA] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 * |