EP0963950 - Process for the preparation of lamellair lithium aluminate and its use as PVC stabilizer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.08.2002 [2002/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CECA S.A. 4 - 8, Cours Michelet, La Défense 10 92800 Puteaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/50] | For all designated states CECA S.A. 4 - 8, Cours Michelet, La Défense 10 92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Plee, Dominique 3 allée du Martin Pêcheur 64140 Lons / FR | [1999/50] | Representative(s) | Treuil, Claude, et al ARKEMA Département Propriété Industrielle 4-8, cours Michelet, La Défense 10 92091 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/42] | Treuil, Claude, et al Atofina Département Propriété Industrielle 4-8 cours Michelet La Défense 10 92091 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1999/50] | Haicour, Philippe ELF ATOCHEM S.A., Département Propriété Industrielle. 4-8, Cours Michelet, La Défense 10 92091 Paris Cédex 42 / FR | Application number, filing date | 99401298.7 | 01.06.1999 | [1999/50] | Priority number, date | FR19980007159 | 08.06.1998 Original published format: FR 9807159 | [1999/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0963950 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C01F7/00, C08K3/22 | [1999/50] | CPC: |
C08K3/22 (EP,US);
C01F7/57 (EP,US);
C01F7/784 (EP,US);
C01P2002/22 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/22, C08L57/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2000/34] |
Former [1999/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von schichtförmigem Lithiumaluminat und dessen Verwendung als PVC-Stabilisator | [1999/50] | English: | Process for the preparation of lamellair lithium aluminate and its use as PVC stabilizer | [1999/50] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'aluminate de lithium lamellaire, son utilisation comme stabilisant du PVC | [1999/50] | Examination procedure | 18.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/50] | 02.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/34] | 19.03.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | ES509691 [ ] (CONSEJO SUPERIOR DE INVESTIGACIONES CIENTIFICAS.); | [A]EP0103034 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-7 *; | [X]EP0672619 (MIZUSAWA INDUSTRIAL CHEM [JP]) [X] 11 * page 3, lignes 14-16; page 7, lgnes 48-51; revendications *; | [A]EP0723933 (KEMIRA KEMI AB [SE]); | [A] - J.C. SERNA PEREDA, "Aluminium lithium hydroxide.", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19840109), vol. 100, no. 2, Database accession no. 9461, page 160, XP002091373 [A] 1-10 * abstract * |