blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0971482

EP0971482 - Digital signal transformation device and method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  25.03.2011
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip25.03.2011Refusal of applicationpublished on 27.04.2011  [2011/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Majani, Eric
7, rue Château-Renault
3500 Rennes / FR
02 / Onno, Patrice
60 avenue du Sergent Maginot
3500 Rennes / FR
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Santarelli
Tour Trinity
1 bis Esplanade de la Défense
92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Rinuy, Santarelli
14, avenue de la Grande Armée, B.P. 237
75822 Paris Cédex 17 / FR
Application number, filing date99401411.610.06.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateFR1998000882409.07.1998         Original published format: FR 9808824
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0971482
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.10.1999
ClassificationIPC:H03M7/30, G06F17/14
[2000/02]
CPC:
H03M7/3053 (EP,US); H04N19/45 (EP,US); H04N19/60 (EP,US);
H04N19/635 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2000/38]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur digitalen Signaltransformation[2000/02]
English:Digital signal transformation device and method[2000/02]
French:Dispositif et procédé de transformation numérique d'un signal[2000/02]
Examination procedure30.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/30]
23.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.02.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.11.2010Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/17]
22.11.2010Date of oral proceedings
10.12.2010Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/17]
10.12.2010Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
24.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
23.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
22.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
20.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
20.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
24.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
28.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0744701  (SONY CORP [JP]);
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.