blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0978783

EP0978783 - System for the execution management of a program in an intergrated circuit device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.05.2017
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.05.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.06.2017  [2017/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gemalto SA
6, rue de la Verrerie
92190 Meudon / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/03]For all designated states
Gemalto SA
6, rue de la Verrerie
92190 Meudon / FR
Former [2004/40]For all designated states
Axalto S.A.
50, avenue Jean Jaurès
92120 Montrouge / FR
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
SCHLUMBERGER Systèmes
50, avenue Jean Jaurès
92120 Montrouge / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Fornas, Thierry M.
17 avenue de l'Europe, Appartement 116-Bâtiment A2
94230 Cachan / FR
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Cassagne, Philippe M.J., et al
Thales Dis France SAS
Intellectual Property Department
6, rue de la Verrerie
92190 Meudon / FR
[N/P]
Former [2006/26]Cour, Pierre
Axalto SA IP & Licensing Department 6, rue de la Verrerie
92197 Meudon Cedex / FR
Former [2000/06]Lemoyne, Didier
Schlumberger Industries, Test & Transactions, BP 620-04
92542 Montrouge-Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date99401474.415.06.1999
[2000/06]
Priority number, dateFR1998000752915.06.1998         Original published format: FR 9807529
[2000/06]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0978783
Date:09.02.2000
Language:FR
[2000/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.12.1999
ClassificationIPC:G06F9/38
[2000/06]
CPC:
G06F9/3806 (EP); G06F9/30054 (EP,US); G06F9/323 (EP,US);
G06F9/4486 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   GB,   IT [2000/42]
Former [2000/06]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Steuerung der Programmausführung in einer intergrierten Schaltung[2000/06]
English:System for the execution management of a program in an intergrated circuit device[2000/06]
French:Procédé de gestion de l'exécution d'un programme dans un dispositif à circuit intégré[2000/06]
Examination procedure18.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/28]
10.10.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.04.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.01.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/25]
03.02.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2017/25]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.10.2008
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
28.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
28.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
28.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
14.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
29.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
29.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
29.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 13
27.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 14
24.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 15
20.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 16
25.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 17
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201618   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US3974480  (GERNELLE FRANCOIS);
 [A]US5535397  (DURANTE RICHARD J [US], et al);
 [A]EP0742513  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]);
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.