EP1067740 - Method for transmitting variable sized packets from an upper layer of a stack of communication protocol layers to a lower layer intended to manage fixed sized packets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.04.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.06.2004 [2004/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Information Technology Centre Europe B.V. Capronilaan 46 1119 NS Schiphol Rijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Information Technology Centre Europe B.V. Capronilaan 46 1119 NS Schiphol Rijk / NL | ||
Former [2001/02] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Information Technology Centre Europe B.V. Keienbergweg 58 1101 AG Amsterdam Zuidoost / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pitcho, Francis Immeuble Germanium, 80, av. des Buttes de Coesmes 35700 Rennes / FR | 02 /
Rambaud, Luc Immeuble Germanium, 80, av. des Buttes de Coesmes 35700 Rennes / FR | 03 /
Bonneville, Hervé Immeuble Germanium 80,avenue des Buttes de Coesme 35700 Rennes / FR | [2001/02] | Representative(s) | Maillet, Alain Cabinet Le Guen Maillet 5, place Newquay B.P. 70250 35802 Dinard Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [N/P] | Maillet, Alain Cabinet Le Guen Maillet 5 Place Newquay B.P. 70250 25802 Dinard Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2001/02] | Maillet, Alain SCP Le Guen & Maillet, 5, Place Newquay, B.P. 70250 35802 Dinard Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 99401476.9 | 15.06.1999 | [2001/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1067740 | Date: | 10.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56, H04Q11/04 | [2001/02] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0478 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5652 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5674 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2001/48] |
Former [2001/45] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, LI | ||
Former [2001/39] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2001/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum übertragen von paketen variabler länge zwischen einer höheren protokollschicht und einer niedrigeren, mit paketen fester länge werkenden, protokollschicht | [2001/02] | English: | Method for transmitting variable sized packets from an upper layer of a stack of communication protocol layers to a lower layer intended to manage fixed sized packets | [2001/02] | French: | Procédé pour transmettre des paquets de taille variable entre une couche de protocole supérieure et une couche de protocole inférieure, qui utilise des paquets de taille fixe | [2001/02] | Examination procedure | 10.09.2001 | Examination requested [2002/02] | 27.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/23] | 02.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.09.2001 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   10.09.2001 | 04.09.2001 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   10.09.2001 | 04.09.2001 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   10.09.2001 | 04.09.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2001 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   10.09.2001 | 04.09.2001 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   10.09.2001 | 04.09.2001 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   10.09.2001 | 04.09.2001 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   10.09.2001 | 04.09.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 04.09.2001 | M01   Fee paid on   10.09.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]WO9818286 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA], et al) [X] 1,3,6,8,10,13,15 * figures 2-4 * * page 4, line 6 - page 5, line 7 * * page 6, line 4 - page 8, line 17 * [A] 18,19 [Y] 2,4,5,7,9,11,12,14,16,17; | [YA]WO9818287 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA], et al) [Y] 2,4,5,9,11,12,16,17 * figure 3 * * page 3, line 10 - line 29 * * page 6, line 35 - page 8, line 34 * [A] 1,8,15; | [Y]WO9834380 (GTE GOVERNMENT SYST [US]) [Y] 7,14 * figure 2B ** page 10, line 18 - line 20 * |