EP0971281 - Method and system for license management in a context client/server [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BULL S.A. 68, route de Versailles 78430 Louveciennes / FR | [2000/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dujonc, Jean-Yves 27 bis, avenue Pasteur 78580 Maule / FR | 02 /
Leydier, Pascal 2, impasse des Peupliers 91730 Torfou / FR | 03 /
Machet, François 2ter C, rue du Pont de Pierre 91400 Orsay / FR | [2000/02] | Application number, filing date | 99401534.5 | 21.06.1999 | [2000/02] | Priority number, date | FR19980008806 | 09.07.1998 Original published format: FR 9808806 | [2000/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0971281 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/00 | [2000/02] | CPC: |
G06F21/105 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2000/38] |
Former [2000/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Verwaltung von Lizenzen in einen Benutzer/Anbieter | [2000/02] | English: | Method and system for license management in a context client/server | [2000/02] | French: | Procédé et système de gestion de licences dans un contexte client/serveur | [2000/02] | Examination procedure | 12.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/36] | 20.04.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5706427 (TABUKI TAKAAKI) [X] 1-5 * figures 1,2,6 * * column 3, line 47 - column 5, line 44 * * column 7, line 59 - column 8, line 46 *; | [A]US5542046 (CARLSON BRENT A ET AL) [A] 1-3 * figures 1-3 * * column 4, line 55 - column 7, line 8 * |