Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6528073 | 04.03.2003 | B2 | US2001033846 | 25.10.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9809793 | 30.07.1998 | US35795699 | 21.07.1999 | US86738101 | 31.05.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3488142B | Global Dossier | 19.01.2004 | B2 | JP2000053527 | 22.02.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9809793 | 30.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0976390 | Global Dossier | 14.11.2001 | B1 | EP0976390 | 02.02.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9809793 | 30.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9903317 | 30.05.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9809793 | 30.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2277862 | 30.01.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9809793 | 30.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69900455T | 02.05.2002 | T2 | DE69900455D1 | 20.12.2001 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR9809793 | 30.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2167991T | 16.05.2002 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR9809793 | 30.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2781666 | 08.09.2000 | B1 | FR2781666 | 04.02.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9809793 | 30.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100328003B | 09.03.2002 | B1 | KR20000011873 | 25.02.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9809793 | 30.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6280750 | 28.08.2001 | B1 | US2001014313 | 16.08.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9809793 | 30.07.1998 |