EP0976390 - Solid cosmetic composition and its uses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2002 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.11.2002 [2002/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/05] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roulier, Véronique 14, rue Pierre Dupont 75010 Paris / FR | 02 /
Quemin, Eric 20 bis, rue d'Artois 93290 Tremblay en France / FR | [2000/05] | Representative(s) | Rasson, Catherine L'Oréal D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier 92600 Asnières / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/05] | Rasson, Catherine L'OREAL-DPI 6 rue Bertrand Sincholle 92585 Clichy Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 99401624.4 | 30.06.1999 | [2000/05] | Priority number, date | FR19980009793 | 30.07.1998 Original published format: FR 9809793 | [2000/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0976390 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0976390 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/48 | [2000/05] | CPC: |
A61K8/0229 (EP,US);
A61K8/72 (KR);
A61K8/73 (EP,US);
A61K8/733 (EP,US);
A61K8/87 (EP,US);
A61Q1/06 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
A61Q5/00 (EP,US);
A61K2800/594 (EP,US);
Y10S424/05 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/41] |
Former [2000/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Feste kosmetische Zubereitung und ihre Anwendungen | [2000/05] | English: | Solid cosmetic composition and its uses | [2000/05] | French: | Composition cosmétique solide et ses utilisations | [2000/05] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/29] | 12.01.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 29.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 09.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 14.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4647470 (SANDERSON GEORGE R [US], et al); | [A]US4746528 (PREST COLIN T [GB], et al); | [A]GB2219803 (MERCK & CO INC [US]); | [A]US5342626 (WINSTON JR PHILIP E [US], et al); | [DA]EP0667148 (HISAMITSU PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]); | [DA]WO9717055 (OREAL [FR], et al); | [DA]WO9717053 (OREAL [FR], et al); | [DA]EP0803245 (INTERCOS ITALIANA [IT]) | Examination | EP0930017 |