EP0978697 - Method and device for injecting a refrigerant in a product mixing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 23.05.2007 [2007/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'air Liquide, S.A. à Directoire et Conseil de Surveillance pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/17] | For all designated states L'air Liquide, S.A. à Directoire et Conseil de Surveillance pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2000/06] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cloarec, Alain 14/22, rue de l'Yvette 91160 Longjumeau / FR | [2000/06] | Representative(s) | Mellul-Bendelac, Sylvie Lisette, et al L'Air Liquide Direction des Services De la Propriété Intellectuelle 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/06] | Mellul, Sylvie Lisette, et al L'Air Liquide, Service Propriété Industrielle, 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 99401672.3 | 05.07.1999 | [2000/06] | Priority number, date | FR19980010052 | 05.08.1998 Original published format: FR 9810052 | [2000/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0978697 | Date: | 09.02.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0978697 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F25D3/10 | [2000/06] | CPC: |
A23L3/363 (EP,US);
A23L3/37 (EP,US);
A23L3/375 (EP,US);
B01F23/565 (EP,US);
B01F29/61 (EP,US);
B01F35/7179 (EP,US);
B01F35/91 (EP,US);
F25D29/001 (EP,US);
F25D3/102 (EP,US);
B01F2035/98 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/06] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Einspritzung eines Kältemittels in eine Mischmaschine für Produkte | [2000/06] | English: | Method and device for injecting a refrigerant in a product mixing machine | [2000/06] | French: | Dispositif et procédé d'injection d'un fluide frigorigene dans un appareil melangeur de produits | [2000/06] | Examination procedure | 09.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/41] | 25.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.12.2003 | CY | 10.12.2003 | FI | 10.12.2003 | IE | 10.12.2003 | GR | 10.03.2004 | LU | 05.07.2004 | MC | 31.07.2004 | [2007/21] |
Former [2005/23] | AT | 10.12.2003 | |
FI | 10.12.2003 | ||
IE | 10.12.2003 | ||
GR | 10.03.2004 | ||
LU | 05.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 10.12.2003 | |
FI | 10.12.2003 | ||
IE | 10.12.2003 | ||
GR | 10.03.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | AT | 10.12.2003 | |
FI | 10.12.2003 | ||
IE | 10.12.2003 | ||
GR | 10.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | AT | 10.12.2003 | |
FI | 10.12.2003 | ||
GR | 10.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 10.12.2003 | |
FI | 10.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 10.12.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR1416735 (AIR PROD & CHEM) [Y] 1,10,11,15 * page 1, column L, paragraph L - page 4, column L, paragraph 2; figure . *; | [A]FR1541325 (UNION CARBIDE CORP); | [A]FR2302479 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]) [A] 1,2,9-12,15 * page 2, line 32 - page 5, line 11; figure . *; | [A]FR2532821 (CARBOXYQUE FRANCAISE [FR]) [A] 1,5,9,11,14 * page 4, line 1 - page 6, line 13; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0166655 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]) [A] 1,10,11,15 * page 4, column 14, line 7 - page 7, columns 1-3 *; | [A]EP0252312 (MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH [DE]); | [A]US5104232 (LENNOX III JOHN M [US]) [A] 1,5,6,11,14 * column 5, line 15 - column 9, line 68; figures 1-17 *; | [A]EP0711511 (BOC GROUP INC [US]); | [YA]US5603567 (PEACOCK RICHARD [US]) [Y] 1,10,11,15 * column 4, line 13 - column 6, line 59; figures 1-5 * [A] 5,9,14 |