blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0973175

EP0973175 - Electrical cable adaptated for high-voltage application [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  02.04.2004
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip02.04.2004Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 19.05.2004  [2004/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd.
1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-city
Mie 510-8503 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd.
1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho
Yokkaichi-City, Mie, 510-8503 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tanigawa, Hidemi, c/o Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd
1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho
Yokkaichi-city, Mie 510-8503 / JP
02 / Sugita, Takahiko, c/o Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd
1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho
Yokkaichi-city, Mie 510-8503 / JP
03 / Kobayashi, Yoshinao, Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd
1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho
Yokkaichi-city, Mie 510-8503 / JP
04 / Inoue, Hiroshi, c/o Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd
1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho
Yokkaichi-city, Mie 510-8503 / JP
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Uchida, Kenji, et al
Fédit-Loriot
38, avenue Hoche
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Uchida, Kenji, et al
S.A. Fedit-Loriot et Autres Conseils en Propriété Industrielle, 38, avenue Hoche
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date99401753.112.07.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateJP1998019733113.07.1998         Original published format: JP 19733198
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0973175
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0973175
Date:29.11.2000
[2000/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.10.2000
ClassificationIPC:H01B7/00
[2000/03]
CPC:
H01B7/0063 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/33]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Elektrisches Kabel geeignet für Hochspannungsanwendung[2000/03]
English:Electrical cable adaptated for high-voltage application[2000/03]
French:Câble électrique adapté à l'utilisation haute tension[2000/03]
Examination procedure16.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
13.02.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.03.2004Application withdrawn by applicant  [2004/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
20.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
16.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0766268  (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS [JP]) [A] 1,5 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0690459  (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS [JP]) [A] 1,5 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.