08.01.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] |
29.08.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] |
09.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.06.2008 [2008/24] |
02.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] |
25.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] |
18.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] |
21.03.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] |
01.02.2008 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 05.03.2008 [2008/10] |
23.02.2007 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.03.2007 [2007/13] |
10.02.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
10.02.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
07.10.2006 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.08.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.08.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.08.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.02.2004 |
Change - representative |
published on 24.03.2004 [2004/13] |
07.08.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.08.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
02.08.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
09.10.2000 |
Change - extension states |
|
18.08.2000 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 04.10.2000 [2000/40] |
28.07.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 13.09.2000 [2000/37] |
28.07.2000 |
Change - representative |
published on 13.09.2000 [2000/37] |
03.12.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.01.2000 [2000/03] |