EP0972543 - Quick-release device for protective hood [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, LU | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ulmer Aeronautique 169, rue de Paris 93000 Bobigny / FR | [2000/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nicolas, Paul 32, rue d'Amblivillers 91370 Verrières le Buisson / FR | [2000/03] | Representative(s) | CAPRI 33 rue de Naples 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/13] | CAPRI 33, rue de Naples 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2000/37] | Riege, Christian Cabinet CAPRI, 94, avenue Mozart 75016 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2000/03] | Boivin, Claude 9, rue Edouard-Charton 78000 Versailles / FR | Application number, filing date | 99401754.9 | 13.07.1999 | [2000/03] | Priority number, date | FR19980009126 | 13.07.1998 Original published format: FR 9809126 | [2000/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0972543 | Date: | 19.01.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0972543 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A62B17/04 | [2000/03] | CPC: |
A62B17/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/03] | Title | German: | Schnellöffnung für Schutzhaube | [2000/03] | English: | Quick-release device for protective hood | [2000/03] | French: | Dispositif d'ouverture rapide d'une cagoule de protection | [2000/03] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/37] | 11.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.03.2007 | CY | 28.03.2007 | DK | 28.03.2007 | FI | 28.03.2007 | GB | 28.03.2007 | IE | 28.03.2007 | IT | 28.03.2007 | NL | 28.03.2007 | SE | 28.06.2007 | GR | 29.06.2007 | DE | 02.07.2007 | ES | 09.07.2007 | LU | 13.07.2007 | BE | 31.07.2007 | CH | 31.07.2007 | LI | 31.07.2007 | MC | 31.07.2007 | PT | 28.08.2007 | [2010/06] |
Former [2008/40] | AT | 28.03.2007 | |
DK | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
GB | 28.03.2007 | ||
IE | 28.03.2007 | ||
IT | 28.03.2007 | ||
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
GR | 29.06.2007 | ||
DE | 02.07.2007 | ||
ES | 09.07.2007 | ||
BE | 31.07.2007 | ||
CH | 31.07.2007 | ||
LI | 31.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 28.03.2007 | |
DK | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
GB | 28.03.2007 | ||
IE | 28.03.2007 | ||
IT | 28.03.2007 | ||
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
GR | 29.06.2007 | ||
DE | 02.07.2007 | ||
ES | 09.07.2007 | ||
CH | 31.07.2007 | ||
LI | 31.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 28.03.2007 | |
DK | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
GB | 28.03.2007 | ||
IE | 28.03.2007 | ||
IT | 28.03.2007 | ||
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
GR | 29.06.2007 | ||
DE | 02.07.2007 | ||
ES | 09.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 28.03.2007 | |
DK | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
GB | 28.03.2007 | ||
IE | 28.03.2007 | ||
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
GR | 29.06.2007 | ||
DE | 02.07.2007 | ||
ES | 09.07.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/17] | AT | 28.03.2007 | |
DK | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
IE | 28.03.2007 | ||
NL | 28.03.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
DE | 02.07.2007 | ||
ES | 09.07.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2446530 (DE GRAZIA JOSEPH, et al); | [A]GB2148697 (CAMBERLEY RUBBER MOULDING LIMI) [A] 1 * page 1, line 114 - page 2, line 119; figure - *; | [A]US4573217 (REED CLIFFORD C [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 12 - column 5, line 2; figure - * |