EP0976850 - Apparatus and method for recycling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.07.2002 [2002/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'air Liquide, S.A. à Directoire et Conseil de Surveillance pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/17] | For all designated states L'air Liquide, S.A. à Directoire et Conseil de Surveillance pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2000/05] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Belot, Dominique Shinonome Technical Center, Air liquide japan Ltd 9-1 Shinonome 1 chome, Koto-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Dhainaut, Bernard, Air Liquide Korea Serv. Co. Ltd 5F, Shindong Bldg. 726-164-Hannam-Dong Yongsan-ku, Seoul 140-210 / KR | 03 /
Nagamura, TTakashi Harima Technical Center, Air Liquide japan, Ltd 16 Niijima Harima-cho Kako-gun Hyogo-ken / JP | 04 /
Imanaga, Tetsuya Shinonome Tech. Center, Air Liquide japan, Ltd 9-1, Shinonome 1 chome, Koto-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2000/05] | Representative(s) | Vesin, Jacques, et al L'Air Liquide S.A. Service Propriété Industrielle, 75 Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/05] | Vesin, Jacques, et al L'AIR LIQUIDE, S.A., Service Propriété Industrielle, 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 99401762.2 | 13.07.1999 | [2000/05] | Priority number, date | JP19980205234 | 21.07.1998 Original published format: JP 20523498 | [2000/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0976850 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0976850 | Date: | 19.07.2000 | [2000/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C23F1/24, H01L21/306, C01C1/02 | [2000/29] | CPC: |
B01D3/02 (KR);
C01C1/024 (EP);
H01L21/6704 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/05] | C23F1/24, H01L21/306 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/14] |
Former [2000/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Einrichtung und Verfahren zum Recycling | [2000/05] | English: | Apparatus and method for recycling | [2000/05] | French: | Appareil et méthode de recyclage | [2000/05] | Examination procedure | 19.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/12] | 02.05.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0176100 (AUSTRIA METALL [AT]) [X] 1-3 * figure 1 * * claim 1 * [A] 5,7,9; | [YA]US4855023 (CLARK R SCOT [US], et al) [Y] 5-10 * column 2, line 59 - column 4, line 32 * * column 18, line 40 - column 19, line 56 * * figure 1 * * claims 1-9,15-21 * [A] 1-3; | [YA]WO9639265 (STARTEC VENTURES INC [US], et al) [Y] 5-10 * page 2, line 29 - page 3, line 30 * * page 4, line 16 - page 6, line 37 * * page 7, line 27 - page 9, line 30 * * page 10, line 15 - line 19 * [A] 1-3 |