EP0974317 - Anchoring shaft for hip joint prosthesis and set of such shafts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2005 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEJUI, Jacques 14, rue Tête d'Or 69006 Lyon / FR | For all designated states Carret, Jean-Paul 13bis, Quai Pierre Scize 69009 Lyon / FR | For all designated states Chavane, Hervé 42, Montée du Petit Versailles 69300 Caluire / FR | For all designated states Pibarot, Vincent 51, Grande Rue de la Guillotière 69007 Lyon / FR | For all designated states Tayot, Olivier 27, rue Vaubecour 69002 Lyon / FR | [2000/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/04] | Representative(s) | Robert, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Boettcher 16, rue Médéric 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/04] | Robert, Jean-Pierre, et al CABINET BOETTCHER, 22, rue du Général Foy 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 99401870.3 | 23.07.1999 | [2000/04] | Priority number, date | FR19980009504 | 24.07.1998 Original published format: FR 9809504 | [2000/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0974317 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0974317 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/36, A61F2/46 | [2000/04] | CPC: |
A61F2/36 (EP);
A61F2/30767 (EP);
A61F2/3662 (EP);
A61F2/367 (EP);
A61F2/3672 (EP);
A61F2/3676 (EP);
A61F2/4607 (EP);
A61F2002/30112 (EP);
A61F2002/30125 (EP);
A61F2002/30153 (EP);
A61F2002/30158 (EP);
A61F2002/30331 (EP);
A61F2002/30332 (EP);
A61F2002/30403 (EP);
A61F2002/30614 (EP);
A61F2002/30616 (EP);
A61F2002/3069 (EP);
A61F2002/30813 (EP);
A61F2002/30906 (EP);
A61F2002/3611 (EP);
A61F2002/3625 (EP);
A61F2002/365 (EP);
A61F2002/4619 (EP);
A61F2220/0025 (EP);
A61F2220/0033 (EP);
A61F2230/0004 (EP);
A61F2230/0008 (EP);
A61F2230/0019 (EP);
A61F2230/0026 (EP);
A61F2310/00023 (EP);
A61F2310/00796 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/04] | Title | German: | Verankerungsschaft für Hüftgelenkprothese und Satz von solchen Schäften | [2000/04] | English: | Anchoring shaft for hip joint prosthesis and set of such shafts | [2000/04] | French: | Tige d'ancrage pour prothèse articulaire de hanche et jeu de telles tiges | [2000/04] | Examination procedure | 20.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/34] | 23.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.03.2004 | CY | 03.03.2004 | FI | 03.03.2004 | GB | 03.03.2004 | IE | 03.03.2004 | NL | 03.03.2004 | DK | 03.06.2004 | GR | 03.06.2004 | SE | 03.06.2004 | DE | 04.06.2004 | ES | 14.06.2004 | LU | 23.07.2004 | CH | 31.07.2004 | LI | 31.07.2004 | MC | 31.07.2004 | PT | 03.08.2004 | [2016/21] |
Former [2008/17] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
CY | 03.03.2004 | ||
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
GB | 03.03.2004 | ||
IE | 03.03.2004 | ||
NL | 03.03.2004 | ||
DK | 03.06.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
DE | 04.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
LU | 23.07.2004 | ||
CH | 31.07.2004 | ||
LI | 31.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
PT | 03.08.2004 | ||
Former [2007/21] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
CY | 03.03.2004 | ||
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
GB | 03.03.2004 | ||
IE | 03.03.2004 | ||
NL | 03.03.2004 | ||
DK | 03.06.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
DE | 04.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
LU | 23.07.2004 | ||
CH | 31.07.2004 | ||
LI | 31.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/25] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
GB | 03.03.2004 | ||
IE | 03.03.2004 | ||
NL | 03.03.2004 | ||
DK | 03.06.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
DE | 04.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
LU | 23.07.2004 | ||
CH | 31.07.2004 | ||
LI | 31.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
GB | 03.03.2004 | ||
IE | 03.03.2004 | ||
NL | 03.03.2004 | ||
DK | 03.06.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
DE | 04.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
LU | 23.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
GB | 03.03.2004 | ||
IE | 03.03.2004 | ||
NL | 03.03.2004 | ||
DK | 03.06.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
DE | 04.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
GB | 03.03.2004 | ||
IE | 03.03.2004 | ||
NL | 03.03.2004 | ||
DK | 03.06.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
DE | 04.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
GB | 03.03.2004 | ||
IE | 03.03.2004 | ||
NL | 03.03.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
DE | 04.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/05] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
GB | 03.03.2004 | ||
IE | 03.03.2004 | ||
NL | 03.03.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/03] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
GB | 03.03.2004 | ||
IE | 03.03.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
GB | 03.03.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
ES | 14.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 03.03.2004 | |
FI | 03.03.2004 | ||
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 03.03.2004 | |
GR | 03.06.2004 | ||
SE | 03.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 03.03.2004 | |
SE | 03.06.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2625433 (LEROY PAUL [FR]) [A] 6,8 * page 2, line 37 - page 3, line 1; figures 3,4 *; | [A]FR2629707 (ROUX JEAN PIERRE [FR], et al) [A] 6-8 * page 11, line 19 - page 12, line 1; figure 4; claim 9 *; | [A]FR2636837 (CREMASCOLI SPA G [IT]) [A] 6-8 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2639820 (IMPLANTS INSTR CH FAB [FR]) [A] 6,8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0477113 (MEDINOV SA [FR]) [A] 6,8 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2666984 (IMPACT [FR], et al); | [YA]FR2678509 (BOUDOT) [Y] 2 * the whole document * [A] 1; | [XAY]GB2281213 (BIOMET LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,3,4 * the whole document * [A] 6,8 [Y] 2,5; | [A]EP0700670 (CRAWSHAW CHARLES [GB], et al) [A] 1,3,4 * abstract *; | [A]FR2729292 (MEDINOV SA [FR]) [A] 6-8,9-11 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2735970 (HOWMEDICA FRANCE [FR]) [A] 1,7,1 * abstract *; | [Y]US5792143 (SAMUELSON KENT M [US], et al) [Y] 5 * column A; figure 6 * |