EP0978241 - Device for applying make-up having a brush, its production method and application unit using such a device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.04.2004 [2004/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/06] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gueret, Jean-Louis 27 Avenue Raymond Poincaré 75016 Paris / FR | [2000/06] | Representative(s) | Leszczynski, André Cabinet Nony 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/06] | Leszczynski, André NONY & ASSOCIES 29, rue Cambacérès 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 99401930.5 | 28.07.1999 | [2000/06] | Priority number, date | FR19980009928 | 03.08.1998 Original published format: FR 9809928 | [2000/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0978241 | Date: | 09.02.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0978241 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A45D40/26, A46B9/02 | [2000/06] | CPC: |
A45D40/267 (EP,US);
A45D40/00 (KR);
A46B3/18 (EP,US);
A46B9/021 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/43] |
Former [2000/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Auftragen von Schminkprodukten mit einer Bürste, Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung und Auftragseinheit mit einer solchen Vorrichtung | [2000/06] | English: | Device for applying make-up having a brush, its production method and application unit using such a device | [2000/06] | French: | Dispositif pour l'application d'un produit de maquillage comportant une brosse, procédé de fabrication et applicateur | [2000/06] | Examination procedure | 12.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/23] | 27.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]GB2074443 (REVLON) [Y] 1-4,6,8,10,12,13,16,19,20,23,32,33 * abstract * * figures 1-5 * [A] 27-31; | [Y]US5556214 (ASCOLESE SALVATOARE J [US]) [Y] 1-4,6,8,10,12,13,16,19,20,23,32,33 * column 3, line 16 - line 22 * * claims 1,5,6 * * figures 3-6 *; | [DA]FR2738127 (OREAL [FR]) [DA] 5,9,11,17,24,25 * claims 7,8 * * figures 3-7 *; | [A]US5188131 (TOLL CHARLOTTE [US]) [A] 7 * figure 4 * | by applicant | FR2738127 |