EP0979805 - Composition for generating smoke based on rosin derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.07.2003 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.08.2003 [2003/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETIENNE LACROIX - TOUS ARTIFICES SA 6, Boulevard de Joffrery 31600 Muret / FR | [2000/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Groc, Philippe 10, avenue des Pyrénées 31410 Lavernose / FR | 02 /
Grycza, Daniel 93, boulevard Déodat de Séverac 31300 Toulouse / FR | 03 /
Guelou, Yann 32, rue Jean Jaurès 31600 Muret / FR | [2000/07] | Representative(s) | Ahner, Francis Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/07] | Ahner, Francis CABINET REGIMBEAU 26, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 99402010.5 | 06.08.1999 | [2000/07] | Priority number, date | FR19980010245 | 10.08.1998 Original published format: FR 9810245 | [2000/07] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0979805 | Date: | 16.02.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C06D3/00 | [2000/07] | CPC: |
C06D3/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/07] | Title | German: | Rauch erzeugende Zusammensetzung auf Basis von Kolophonium-Derivate | [2000/07] | English: | Composition for generating smoke based on rosin derivatives | [2000/07] | French: | Composition fumigène à base de dérivés de colophane | [2000/07] | Examination procedure | 07.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/40] | 11.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/35] | 18.03.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2003/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]LU85676 (RADERMECKER INTERCHIMIE S A [BE]) [A] 1,7-9 * claim - *; | [A]FR2089816 (LINDESBERGS IND AB) [A] 1,7-9 * claims 24,25 *; | [A]USH233H (G.V. TRACY) [A] 1,7-9 * claim - *; | HU49837 [ ]; | [A] - A. VAMOS ET AL., "Smoke-generating agent for tightness test of smoke passages.", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19900611), vol. 112, no. 24, Database accession no. 219929z, page 178, XP000155896 [A] 1,7-9 * abstract * | [A] - B. ELVERS ET AL., Ullmann's Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry, 5th revised edition, Vol. A23, WEINHEIM, DE, VCH, (1993), XP002099878 [A] 1,7-9 * page 81 * * page 84 * * page 86 * |