EP0982064 - PSA process using an agglomerated adsorbent comprising zeolite and binding material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 16.08.2006 [2006/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'air Liquide, S.A. à Directoire et Conseil de Surveillance pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/17] | For all designated states L'air Liquide, S.A. à Directoire et Conseil de Surveillance pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2000/09] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Labasque, Jacques 67, rue Jean de la Fontaine 78000 Versailles / FR | 02 /
Moreau, Serge 22, rue Exelmans 78140 Velizy-Villacoublay / FR | 03 /
Lledos, Bernard 48, rue Hyppolite Thaine 78280 Guyancourt / FR | [2000/09] | Representative(s) | Pittis, Olivier, et al L'Air Liquide, S.A. Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/19] | Pittis, Olivier, et al L'Air Liquide, S.A., Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle, 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2000/09] | Le Moenner, Gabriel, et al L'Air Liquide S.A., DSPI, Service Brevets et Marques, 75 Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 99402052.7 | 12.08.1999 | [2000/09] | Priority number, date | FR19980010622 | 21.08.1998 Original published format: FR 9810622 | [2000/09] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0982064 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0982064 | Date: | 04.05.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/047, B01J20/18 | [2000/09] | CPC: |
B01D53/02 (EP,US);
B01J20/183 (EP,US);
B01J20/186 (EP,US);
B01D2253/108 (EP,US);
B01D2253/1085 (EP,US);
B01D2253/11 (EP,US);
B01D2256/12 (EP,US);
B01D2257/102 (EP,US);
B01D53/0476 (EP,US);
Y10S95/902 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, IT, LI [2000/46] |
Former [2000/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | PSA Verfahren unter Verwendung eines agglomerierten Adsorptionsmittels mit Zeolith und Bindemittel | [2004/42] | English: | PSA process using an agglomerated adsorbent comprising zeolite and binding material | [2000/09] | French: | Procédé PSA utilisant un adsorbant aggloméré constitué d'une phase zéolitique et d'un liant | [2000/09] |
Former [2000/09] | PSA Verfahren unter Verwendung eines agglomeriertes Adsorptionsmittels mit Zeolith und Bindemitteln | Examination procedure | 01.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/44] | 11.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 31.08.2005 | LI | 31.08.2005 | [2006/33] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0667183 (BOC GROUP INC [US]) [X] 1-6,8-10 * page 2, line 1 - line 9 * * page 2, line 39 - page 3, line 3 * * page 3, line 31 - line 39 * * page 4, line 7 - line 28 *; | [Y]EP0685430 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [Y] 1-6,8-10 * page 2, line 3 - line 5 * * page 3, line 3 - page 4, line 22; claims 1-31 *; | [Y]US5174979 (CHAO CHIEN C [US], et al) [Y] 1-6,8-10 * column 1, line 7 - line 14 * * column 4, line 17 - line 59 * * column 7, line 48 - column 8, line 27; claims 1-22 *; | [A]EP0855209 (CECA SA [FR]) [A] 1-6,8-10 * the whole document * |