EP0984610 - Modem with non-volatile memory [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.08.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.10.2002 [2002/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olitec 4, rue des Magnolias 54220 Malzeville / FR | [2000/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pelletier, Didier 18 rue de Buttel 54370 Essey les Nancy / FR | 02 /
De Somer, Thierry 37 rue du Faubourg des Trois Maisons 54000 Nancy / FR | [2000/40] |
Former [2000/10] | 01 /
Pelletier, Didier 79 rue Gambetta 54530 Saint Max / FR | ||
02 /
De Somer, Thierry 37 rue du Faubourg des Trois Maisons 54000 Nancy / FR | Representative(s) | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/10] | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 99402179.8 | 03.09.1999 | [2000/10] | Priority number, date | FR19980011084 | 04.09.1998 Original published format: FR 9811084 | [2000/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0984610 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04M11/06, H04N1/32, H04L12/58 | [2000/10] | CPC: |
H04N1/32379 (EP);
H04M11/06 (EP);
H04N1/2158 (EP);
H04N1/32363 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/10] | Title | German: | Modem mit nichtflüchtigem Speicher | [2000/10] | English: | Modem with non-volatile memory | [2000/10] | French: | Modem à mémoire non volatile | [2000/10] | Examination procedure | 26.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/38] | 31.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/41] | 08.05.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/41] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2001 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]JPH0832742 ; | [Y]US5757891 (WANG KEVIN KUAN-PIN) [Y] 4,5 * column 4, line 44 - column 6, line 9; figure 2D *; | [YA]DE4439195 (ABSTRON INSTRUMENTS GMBH) [Y] 9 * column 1, line 13 - line 64 * * column 2, line 15 - line 65 * [A] 1,2,5,10-13; | [A]LU88213 (FELTEN GUY [LU]) [A] 1-5 * page 2, line 34 - page 4, line 18 *; | [A]US5644594 (JOHNSON GREG ET AL) [A] 6-8,14-18 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 16 * * column 7, line 40 - column 8, line 26 * * figure 2 * | [XAY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960628), vol. 096, no. 006, & JP08032742 A 19960202 (RICOH CO LTD) [X] 1-3 * abstract * [A] 14-18 [Y] 4,5,9 |