EP0986189 - CDMA signals reception method with parallel interference suppression, and its corresponding stage and receiver [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.02.2007 [2007/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 25, rue Leblanc Immeuble Le Ponant D 75015 Paris / FR | [2007/02] |
Former [2006/10] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 31-33, rue de la Fédération 75752 Paris Cédex 15 / FR | ||
Former [2000/11] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 31-33, rue de la Fédération 75752 Paris Cédex 15 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boulanger, Christophe 2, impasse Tellier 94200 Ivry Sur Seine / FR | 02 /
Ouvry, Laurent 3, rue Lachmann 38000 Grenoble / FR | 03 /
Piaget, Bernard - 38610 Venon / FR | 04 /
Fort, Charles Lieu-dit 'Chalamand' 38470 Vatilieu / FR | [2000/11] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstraße 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/24] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/19] | Dendorfer, Claus, et al Wächtershäuser & Hartz Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/02] | Audier, Philippe André, et al Brevalex, 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2000/11] | Des Termes, Monique Société Brevatome 3, rue du Docteur Lanceraux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 99402221.8 | 09.09.1999 | [2000/11] | Priority number, date | FR19980011335 | 11.09.1998 Original published format: FR 9811335 | [2000/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0986189 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0986189 | Date: | 08.03.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/707 | [2000/11] | CPC: |
H04B1/71075 (EP,US);
H04J13/0022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [2000/48] |
Former [2000/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | CDMA-Empfangsverfahren mit paralleler Interferenzunterdrückung, entsprechende Stufe und Empfänger | [2000/11] | English: | CDMA signals reception method with parallel interference suppression, and its corresponding stage and receiver | [2000/11] | French: | Procédé de réception de signaux amrc à suppression parallèle d'interférences, étage et récepteur correspondants | [2000/11] | Examination procedure | 03.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/39] | 16.09.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 21.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 29.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06004668.7 / EP1693969 | Opposition(s) | 11.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.10.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5361276 (SUBRAMANIAN RAVI [US]) [A] 1* column 2, line 38 - column 15, line 52; figure - *; | [A]EP0654913 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [A] 1 * page 4, column 6, line 53 - page 7, column 12, line 35; figure - *; | [A]EP0756387 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [A] 1 * page 7, line 32 - page 14, line 18; figure - *; | [A]DE19623665 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-7 * page 2, line 63 - page 6, line 48; figure - *; | [A]DE19630391 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-7 * page 3, line 36 - page 12, line 29; figure - *; | [XA]EP0852432 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * page 5, column 8, line 14 - page 10, column 18, line 26; figure - * [A] 2-7 |