EP0987911 - Method for the transmission of system information to a mobile station in a cellular radio system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/18] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2006/32] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2000/12] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roberts, Michael 95, avenue du Roule 92200 Neuilly sur Seine / FR | 02 /
Cruchant, Laurent 3, rue Léon Vaudoyer 75007 Paris / FR | [2000/12] | Representative(s) | El Manouni, Josiane, et al Alcatel-Lucent International Patent Business Site Nokia Paris Saclay Route de Villejust 91620 Nozay / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/12] | El Manouni, Josiane, et al COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ALCATEL Dépt. Propr. Industrielle, 30, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 99402270.5 | 16.09.1999 | [2000/12] | Priority number, date | FR19980011610 | 17.09.1998 Original published format: FR 9811610 | [2000/12] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0987911 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0987911 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/22 | [2000/12] | CPC: |
H04W48/08 (EP);
H04W48/12 (EP);
H04W60/00 (EP);
H04W84/042 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/12] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Übertragung von Systeminformationen zu einer Mobilstation in einem Mobilfunksystem | [2006/12] | English: | Method for the transmission of system information to a mobile station in a cellular radio system | [2000/12] | French: | Procédé de transmission d'informations système à une station mobile dans un système cellulaire de radiocommunications mobiles | [2006/12] |
Former [2000/12] | Verfahren zur Übertragung der Systeminformationen zu einer Mobilstation in einem Mobilfunksystem | ||
Former [2000/12] | Procédé de transmission d'information système à une station mobile dans un système cellulaire de radiocommunications mobiles | Examination procedure | 22.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/47] | 03.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.12.2005 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 13.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06116107.1 / EP1701560 | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.08.2006 | CY | 09.08.2006 | FI | 09.08.2006 | IE | 09.08.2006 | NL | 09.08.2006 | LU | 16.09.2006 | BE | 30.09.2006 | CH | 30.09.2006 | LI | 30.09.2006 | MC | 30.09.2006 | DK | 09.11.2006 | SE | 09.11.2006 | GR | 10.11.2006 | ES | 20.11.2006 | PT | 09.01.2007 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/36] | AT | 09.08.2006 | |
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
IE | 09.08.2006 | ||
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
LU | 16.09.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
CH | 30.09.2006 | ||
LI | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
SE | 09.11.2006 | ||
GR | 10.11.2006 | ||
ES | 20.11.2006 | ||
PT | 09.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 09.08.2006 | |
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
IE | 09.08.2006 | ||
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
CH | 30.09.2006 | ||
LI | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
SE | 09.11.2006 | ||
GR | 10.11.2006 | ||
ES | 20.11.2006 | ||
PT | 09.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/17] | AT | 09.08.2006 | |
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
IE | 09.08.2006 | ||
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
CH | 30.09.2006 | ||
LI | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
SE | 09.11.2006 | ||
ES | 20.11.2006 | ||
PT | 09.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 09.08.2006 | |
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
IE | 09.08.2006 | ||
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
SE | 09.11.2006 | ||
ES | 20.11.2006 | ||
PT | 09.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 09.08.2006 | |
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
SE | 09.11.2006 | ||
ES | 20.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | FI | 09.08.2006 | |
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
SE | 09.11.2006 | ||
ES | 20.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | FI | 09.08.2006 | |
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
SE | 09.11.2006 | ||
ES | 20.11.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2294181 (MOTOROLA LTD [GB]) [X] 1-5 * page 3, line 10 - page 4, line 31 *; | [XD] - MOULY M ET AL, ""THE GSM SYSTEM FOR MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS"", GSM SYSTEM FOR MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS, MOULY M;PAUTET M-B, pages 420 - 423, XP002055504 [XD] 1-5 * page 420 - page 423 * |