EP0991154 - Optical semiconductor amplifier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.11.2004 [2004/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avanex Corporation 40919 Encyclopedia Circle Fremont, CA 94538 / US | [2004/02] |
Former [2000/14] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goldstein, Léon Cabinet Ballot-Schmit, 16, Avenue du Pont Royal 94230 Cachan / FR | 02 /
Emery, Jean-Yves Cabinet Ballot-Schmit, 16, Avenue du Pont Royal 94230 Cachan / FR | 03 /
Gaborit, Fabienne Cabinet Ballot-Schmit, 16, Avenue du Pont Royal 94230 Cachan / FR | [2000/14] | Representative(s) | Haines, Miles John L.S., et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/02] | Haines, Miles John, et al D. Young & Co. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | ||
Former [2002/15] | Fournier, Michel Robert Marie, et al COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ALCATEL Département Propriété Industrielle 30, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2000/14] | Ballot, Paul Cabinet Ballot-Schmit, 16, Avenue du Pont Royal 94230 Cachan / FR | Application number, filing date | 99402397.6 | 30.09.1999 | [2000/14] | Priority number, date | FR19980012385 | 02.10.1998 Original published format: FR 9812385 | [2000/14] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0991154 | Date: | 05.04.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01S5/50 | [2000/14] | CPC: |
H01S5/5009 (EP,US);
H01S5/3201 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/14] | Title | German: | Optischer halbleiterverstärker | [2000/14] | English: | Optical semiconductor amplifier | [2000/14] | French: | Amplificateur optique en semi-conducteur | [2000/14] | Examination procedure | 11.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/45] | 29.09.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0606821 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH0864904 ; | [A] - LENZ G ET AL, "FEMTOSECOND DYNAMICS OF THE NONLINEAR ANISOTROPY IN POLARIZATION INSENSITIVE SEMICONDUCTOR OPTICAL AMPLIFIERS", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, (19960520), vol. 68, no. 21, pages 2933 - 2935, XP000588348 [A] 1 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.116359 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960731), vol. 096, no. 007, & JP08064904 A 19960308 (NIPPON TELEGR &TELEPH CORP <NTT>) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - HOLTMANN CH ET AL, "POLARIZATION INDEPENDENT BULK ACTIVE REGION SEMICONDUCTOR OPTICAL AMPLIFIERS FOR 1.3 MUM WAVELENGTHS", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, (19960301), vol. 8, no. 3, pages 343 - 345, XP000582817 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/68.481111 |