EP1091484 - Sample and hold demodulator circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. 7700 W. Parmer Lane Austin, TX 78729 / US | [2006/19] |
Former [2006/14] | For all designated states MOTOROLA SEMICONDUCTEURS S.A. Centre Electronique de Toulouse Avenue General Eisenhower 31023 Toulouse Cédex / FR | ||
Former [2001/15] | For all designated states MOTOROLA SEMICONDUCTEURS S.A. Centre Electronique de Toulouse Avenue General Eisenhower 31023 Toulouse Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burri, Michel 82, Chemin Francois Lehmann 1218 Grand-Saconnex / CH | 02 /
Landez, Christophe 7, rue Lacasssagne, Bât. C2 31300 Toulouse / FR | [2001/15] | Representative(s) | Wharmby, Martin Angus Freescale Semiconductor Inc. c/o Impetus IP Limited Grove House Lutyens Close Basingstoke, Hampshire RG24 8AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/27] | Wharmby, Martin Angus Freescale Semiconductor Inc. c/o Impetus IP Limited Grove House Lutyens Close Basingstoke, Hampshire RG24 8AG / GB | ||
Former [2001/40] | Walker, Neville Daniel Alan, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Section Law Department Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | ||
Former [2001/15] | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 99402422.2 | 04.10.1999 | [2001/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1091484 | Date: | 11.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1091484 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H03D1/22 | [2001/15] | CPC: |
H03D5/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/15] | Title | German: | Demodulatorschaltung unter Verwendung einer Abtast- und Halteschaltung | [2001/15] | English: | Sample and hold demodulator circuit | [2001/15] | French: | Circuit démodulateur utilisant un circuit échantillonneur-bloqueur | [2001/15] | Examination procedure | 11.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/49] | 04.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.04.2006 | BE | 05.04.2006 | CH | 05.04.2006 | CY | 05.04.2006 | FI | 05.04.2006 | LI | 05.04.2006 | NL | 05.04.2006 | DK | 05.07.2006 | SE | 05.07.2006 | GR | 06.07.2006 | ES | 16.07.2006 | PT | 05.09.2006 | IE | 04.10.2006 | LU | 04.10.2006 | MC | 31.10.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/36] | AT | 05.04.2006 | |
BE | 05.04.2006 | ||
CH | 05.04.2006 | ||
FI | 05.04.2006 | ||
LI | 05.04.2006 | ||
NL | 05.04.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
GR | 06.07.2006 | ||
ES | 16.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
IE | 04.10.2006 | ||
LU | 04.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 05.04.2006 | |
BE | 05.04.2006 | ||
CH | 05.04.2006 | ||
FI | 05.04.2006 | ||
LI | 05.04.2006 | ||
NL | 05.04.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
GR | 06.07.2006 | ||
ES | 16.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
IE | 04.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/17] | AT | 05.04.2006 | |
BE | 05.04.2006 | ||
CH | 05.04.2006 | ||
FI | 05.04.2006 | ||
LI | 05.04.2006 | ||
NL | 05.04.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
ES | 16.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
IE | 04.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | AT | 05.04.2006 | |
BE | 05.04.2006 | ||
CH | 05.04.2006 | ||
FI | 05.04.2006 | ||
LI | 05.04.2006 | ||
NL | 05.04.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
ES | 16.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 05.04.2006 | |
CH | 05.04.2006 | ||
FI | 05.04.2006 | ||
LI | 05.04.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
ES | 16.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/02] | AT | 05.04.2006 | |
FI | 05.04.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
ES | 16.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SE | 05.07.2006 | |
ES | 16.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | SE | 05.07.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2100538 (SECR DEFENCE) [A] 1* page 1, column 1, line 23 - page 2, column 2, line 123; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0333491 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 65 - column 8, line 57; figure 1 *; | [A]US5001728 (FUELDNER FRIEDRICH [DE]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 59 - column 3, line 26; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0745747 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 12 - line 53 * * column 3, line 17 - column 5, line 15; figures 1-3 * |