05.12.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] |
01.08.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] |
18.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] |
21.03.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] |
20.04.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2007 [2007/21] |
30.03.2007 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] |
15.12.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.01.2007 [2007/03] |
08.12.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.01.2007 [2007/02] |
10.11.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2006 [2006/50] |
03.11.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.12.2006 [2006/49] |
24.03.2006 |
Change - applicant |
published on 10.05.2006 [2006/19] |
17.02.2006 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
15.02.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
15.02.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
18.10.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.09.2005 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
18.10.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.05.2004 |
Change - representative |
published on 30.06.2004 [2004/27] |
03.03.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
31.10.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
31.10.2003 |
First examination report |
|
16.10.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.10.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
14.03.2002 |
Change - extension states |
|
16.11.2001 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 02.01.2002 [2002/01] |
19.10.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 05.12.2001 [2001/49] |
18.10.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
17.08.2001 |
Change - representative |
published on 04.10.2001 [2001/40] |
23.02.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.04.2001 [2001/15] |