Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1091484 | Global Dossier | 05.04.2006 | B1 | EP1091484 | 11.04.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP99402422 | 04.10.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE322759T | 15.04.2006 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP99402422 | 04.10.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69930745T | 07.09.2006 | T2 | DE69930745D1 | 18.05.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP99402422 | 04.10.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6407629 | 18.06.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | EP99402422 | 04.10.1999 |