EP0992714 - Method and device for controlling an automatic transmission adapted to a strategy for automatically restarting the engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.12.2002 [2002/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renault s.a.s. 13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/34] | For all designated states Renault s.a.s. 13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2000/15] | For all designated states RENAULT 34 Quai du Point du Jour 92109 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leorat, François 98, Boulevard de la Reine 12000 Versailles / FR | [2000/15] | Application number, filing date | 99402470.1 | 08.10.1999 | [2000/15] | Priority number, date | FR19980012655 | 09.10.1998 Original published format: FR 9812655 | [2000/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0992714 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/00 | [2000/15] | CPC: |
F16H61/0031 (EP);
F16H2061/305 (EP);
F16H2312/14 (EP);
F16H2312/20 (EP);
Y02T10/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [2000/52] |
Former [2000/15] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Steuerung eines automatischen Getriebes, angepasst an eine Strategie zum automatischen Wiederanlassen der Kraftmaschine | [2000/15] | English: | Method and device for controlling an automatic transmission adapted to a strategy for automatically restarting the engine | [2000/15] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de pilotage d'une transmission automatique adaptés à une stratégie de redémarrage automatique du moteur | [2000/15] | Examination procedure | 10.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/52] | 13.10.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, FR, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 21.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.11.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE910252 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [A] 1,8 * the whole document *; | [A]WO8703058 (AVON MAXWELL TRANSMISSIONS [GB]) [A] 1,8 * page 2, line 26 - page 3, line 7 *; | [A]DE3423825 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1,8 * page 4, paragraph 2 - page 6, paragraph 1 * | [XA] - "REMOTE TRANSMISSION OIL SUPPLY", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, (19920701), no. 339, page 576, XP000319990 [X] 1-3,5,8 * the whole document * [A] 4,6,9 |